EP2812443 - CD47 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inhibrx, Inc. 11025 N. Torrey Pines Road, Suite 200 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2018/42] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Inhibrx LP 11099 North Torrey Pines Road, Suite 280 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | ||
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Inhibrx LLC 11099 North Torrey Pines Road, Suite 280 La Jolla CA 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKELMAN, Brendan 11025 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 200 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
TIMMER, John 11025 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 200 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
RAZAI, Amir 11025 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 200 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 04 /
DEVERAUX, Quinn 11025 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 200 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 05 /
JONES, Kyle 11025 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 200 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 06 /
NGUY, Peter, L. 11025 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 200 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2019/22] |
Former [2014/51] | 01 /
ECKELMAN, Brendan 11099 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 130 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | ||
02 /
TIMMER, John 11099 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 130 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
03 /
RAZAI, Amir 11099 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 130 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
04 /
DEVERAUX, Quinn 11099 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 130 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
05 /
JONES, Kyle 11099 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 130 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
06 /
NGUY, Peter, L. 11099 N. Torrey Pines Road Suite 130 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 13746964.9 | 06.02.2013 | [2019/22] | WO2013US24995 | Priority number, date | US201261595216P | 06.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261595216 P | US201261659752P | 14.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261659752 P | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013119714 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2812443 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2812443 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/08, A61K39/395, C07K16/28 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (EA,US);
A61K39/39558 (EA,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
C07K14/70503 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (EA,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EA,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,EA,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,EA,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/51] | C12P21/08, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | 04.09.2014 | ME | 04.09.2014 | Title | German: | CD47-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2014/51] | English: | CD47 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2014/51] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CD47 ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 29.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2018 | 08.11.2018 | Observations by third parties | 12.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19173042.3 / EP3578569 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2020
03.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE Forty Seven, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP, et al, et al One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/10] |
Former [2021/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2020
03.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE Forty Seven, Inc. 1490 O'Brien Drive, Suite A Menlo Park CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP, et al, et al One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2020/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2020
03.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE Forty Seven, Inc. 1490 O'Brien Drive, Suite A Menlo Park CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 18.03.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.07.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 07.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T0326/22 | 07.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 29.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.08.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 01.08.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - I. BABIC ET AL, "SHPS-1 Induces Aggregation of Ba/F3 Pro-B Cells Via an Interaction with CD47", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20000401), vol. 164, no. 7, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.164.7.3652, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3652 - 3658, XP055216058 [X] 1,2,4-6,12 * page 3654, column l, paragraph l - page 3655, column r, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.164.7.3652 | [X] - RAVINDRA MAJETI1 ET AL, "CD47 is an adverse prognostic factor and therapeutic antibody target on human acute myeloid leukemia stem cells", DEVELOPMENTAL CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, vol. 138, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2009.05.045, ISSN 1097-4172, (20090723), pages 286 - 299, (20090723), XP002632714 [X] 1,2,4-6,12 * page 288, column r, paragraph 3 - page 290, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CELL.2009.05.045 | [I] - M. P. CHAO ET AL, "Therapeutic Antibody Targeting of CD47 Eliminates Human Acute Lymphoblastic Leukemia", CANCER RESEARCH, (20110215), vol. 71, no. 4, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-2238, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1374 - 1384, XP055029988 [I] 7-9,13-15 * page 1376, column r, paragraph l - page 1380, column l, line 9; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-2238 | [A] - X. W. ZHAO ET AL, "CD47-signal regulatory protein- (SIRP ) interactions form a barrier for antibody-mediated tumor cell destruction", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20111108), vol. 108, no. 45, doi:10.1073/pnas.1106550108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 18342 - 18347, XP055055636 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1106550108 | International search | [Y]US2004147731 (PARKOS CHARLES A [US]); | [A]US2005288491 (WILSON DAVID S [US], et al); | [Y]US2007148163 (TAKAHASHI NOBUAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008131431 (SMITH CRAIG A [US], et al); | [A]US2009035322 (MARTIN JOEL H [US], et al); | [X]US2011014119 (JAISWAL SIDDHARTHA [US], et al); | [A]US2011223107 (TREMBLAY GILLES BERNARD [CA], et al); | [Y] - OLIVEIRA ET AL., "Integrin-associated protein (CD47) is a putative mediator for soluble fibrinogen interaction with human red blood cells membrane.", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (20111104), vol. 1818, no. 3, pages 481 - 90, XP028397658 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamem.2011.10.028 | [A] - "Inorganic pyrophosphatase.", UNIPROT, (20111214), Database accession no. G4EMT6_MYCIO, XP003033834 | [ ] - "IG HEAVY CHAIN V REGION (7D4) - MOUSE (FRAGMENT) [MUS MUSCULUS]", UNIPROTKB, (19990723), Database accession no. C37263, XP003034203 | [A] - STAVNEZER ET AL., "Evolution of isotype switching", SEMIN IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 257 - 75, XP004620322 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.smim.2004.08.005 | [A] - BRINKHOUS ET AL., "Fixation platelets and platelet agglutination/aggregation tests.", METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 169, pages 149 - 63, XP008174638 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(89)69056-8 | other | - KIKUCHI et al., "A bivalent single-chain Fv fragment against CD47 induces apoptosis for leukemic cells", Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20040000), vol. 315, no. 4, pages 912 - 918, XP004491573 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.01.128 | Opposition | EP1931710 |