01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
04.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
09.02.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
05.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.01.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.09.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.06.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.04.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.12.2016 |
First examination report |
|
11.04.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.09.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
18.09.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
18.09.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
10.04.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
28.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
14.11.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
29.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|