EP2879811 - DEVICE FOR CLEANING A SPRAY GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fillon Technologies 2 Route de Houdan 28210 Faverolles / FR | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAINT, Patrick Appartement A203 69 rue du Faubourg Saint-Jean F-28000 Chartres / FR | [2016/35] |
Former [2015/24] | 01 /
SAINT, Patrick 53 Bis rue du Docteur Maunoury F-28000 Chartres / FR | Representative(s) | Godineau, Valérie, et al Ipsilon 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Godineau, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Brema-Loyer 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | Application number, filing date | 13747448.2 | 15.07.2013 | [2016/24] | WO2013FR51686 | Priority number, date | FR20120057414 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: FR 1257414 | [2015/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014020254 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879811 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2879811 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/00, B08B9/032, B05B7/24, B05B15/02, B05B15/12, B44D3/00, B65D83/38 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
B08B9/0321 (EP,CN,US);
B08B3/006 (EP,CN,US);
B05B14/00 (EP,US);
B05B15/55 (EP,US);
B05B15/557 (CN);
B44D3/006 (EP,CN,US);
B05B14/49 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG EINER SPRÜHPISTOLE | [2015/24] | English: | DEVICE FOR CLEANING A SPRAY GUN | [2015/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE POUR PISTOLET DE PULVERISATION | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 23.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2013 | AL | 15.06.2016 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | MT | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | IE | 15.07.2016 | LU | 15.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 15.07.2013 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.07.2013 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 15.07.2013 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.07.2013 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/18] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2745418 (BALCOM JOHN A, et al) [A] 1-11 * figure . ** column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 53 *; | [A]WO2010116070 (FILLON TECHNOLOGIES [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 5, line 31 - page 14, line 32 * |