EP2888696 - ARRANGEMENT FOR AND METHOD OF READING FORMS IN CORRECT ORIENTATION BY IMAGE CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, LLC One Zebra Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Motorola Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Duanfeng 29 Brayton Court N. South Setauket, New York 11720 / US | 02 /
KANNAN, Anu 9 Braemer Road East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | [2015/31] |
Former [2015/27] | 01 /
HE, Duanfeng 29 Brayton Court N. South Setauket, New York 11720 / US | ||
02 /
KANNAN, Anu 549 Riverside Drive New York, New York 10027 / US | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13747608.1 | 01.08.2013 | WO2013US53154 | Priority number, date | US201213594924 | 27.08.2012 Original published format: US201213594924 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014035594 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888696 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/22, G06K9/32 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
G06V30/412 (EP,US);
G06V10/242 (EP,US);
G06V30/142 (EP,US);
G06V30/418 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LESEN VON FORMULAREN IN DER RICHTIGEN RICHTUNG DURCH BILDERFASSUNG | [2015/27] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR AND METHOD OF READING FORMS IN CORRECT ORIENTATION BY IMAGE CAPTURE | [2015/27] | French: | AGENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE DE DOCUMENTS DANS UNE ORIENTATION CORRECTE PAR CAPTURE D'IMAGE | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 15.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 16.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2004081332 (TUTTLE WILLIAM J [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0075] *; | [I]EP1580666 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0078] *; | [I]WO2006010019 (DIGIMARC CORP [US]) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2010019041 (MCCORMICK DOROTHY [US], et al) [A] 2 * figure 1 *; | [I]EP2178028 (XEROX CORP [US]) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] *; | [A]US2011243477 (MINERICH RICHARD T [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A] - L. V. RASMUSSEN ET AL, "Development of an optical character recognition pipeline for handwritten form fields from an electronic health record", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL INFORMATICS ASSOCIATION, (20110902), vol. 19, no. e1, doi:10.1136/amiajnl-2011-000182, ISSN 1067-5027, pages e90 - e95, XP055094613 [A] 7 * page e91 - page e92; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/amiajnl-2011-000182 |