EP2872311 - PROCESS OF MAKING A CONTINUOUS DIELECTRIC FILM COMPRISING DISPERSED NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Secretary of State For Defence Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Matthew Adrian AWE Aldermaston Reading Berkshire RG7 4PR / GB | 02 /
DONOVAN, Sarah Adele AWE Aldermaston Reading Berkshire RG7 4PR / GB | 03 /
LANG, Michelle Silverstone AWE Aldermaston Reading Berkshire RG7 4PR / GB | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Phillips, Thomas Edward Ministry of Defence Defence Intellectual Property Rights Poplar 2 No. 2214 MoD Abbey Wood (South) Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Phillips, Thomas Edward Ministry of Defence Defence Intellectual Property Rights Poplar 2 No.2214 MoD Abbey Wood (South) Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 13747681.8 | 12.07.2013 | [2020/08] | WO2013GB00302 | Priority number, date | GB20120012487 | 13.07.2012 Original published format: GB 201212487 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014009686 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872311 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2872311 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/08, B29C48/16, B29C48/28, B82Y30/00, // H01G4/14 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29C48/142 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29C48/16 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29C48/287 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29C48/288 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,CN,GB,US);
C08K3/08 (US);
C08K3/22 (US);
H01B3/442 (EP,GB,US);
H01G4/18 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H01G4/206 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29B7/90 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29C2948/92219 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29C2948/92714 (EP,GB,US);
B29C43/222 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29K2025/06 (US);
B29K2105/122 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29K2105/124 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29K2105/162 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B29K2505/00 (US);
B29K2505/14 (US);
B29K2995/0006 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2995/006 (GB);
C08J2325/06 (EP,GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | B29C47/10, B29C47/04, B82Y30/00, B29C47/88, B29B7/90, H01G4/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KONTINUIERLICHEN DIELEKTRISCHEN FOLIE MIT DISPERGIERTEN NANOPARTIKELN | [2015/21] | English: | PROCESS OF MAKING A CONTINUOUS DIELECTRIC FILM COMPRISING DISPERSED NANOPARTICLES | [2015/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COUCHE MINCE DIÉLECTRIQUE CONTINUE COMPRENANT DES NANOPARTICULES DISPERSÉES | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.12.2015 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 08.01.2016 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2013 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | ES | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | IT | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | IE | 12.07.2020 | LU | 12.07.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 12.07.2013 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
IE | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.07.2013 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
IE | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
IE | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
IE | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2007116976 (TAN QI [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * claims 1-26 * [Y] 1-8; | [Y]US2007176319 (THOSTENSON ERIK T [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1-19 * * figure 24 *; | [X]EP2025496 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0037] ** claims 1-13 *; | [Y]US2009275689 (ISAYEV AVRAAM [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * claims 1-29 * * figures 3,17 *; | [Y]EP2154177 (K & S AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0029] * * claims 1-18 * * figures 1-2 *; | [XY]US2010267883 (BHATT SANJIV M [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0122] * * example 10 * * figures 10-11 * [Y] 2-8; | [XY]EP2305743 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0039] * * claims 1-15 * [Y] 1-8; | [XDY]GB2478843 (SECR DEFENCE [GB]) [XD] 9,10 * abstract * * page 7, lines 14-18 * * claims 1-15 * [Y] 1-8 |