EP3030943 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A FLOOR-CLEANING DEVICE AND FLOOR-CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robart GmbH Friedhofstrasse 4 4020 Linz / AT | [2020/37] |
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher SE & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | ||
For all designated states Robart GmbH Friedhofstrasse 4 4020 Linz / AT | |||
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | ||
For all designated states Robart GmbH Friedhofstrasse 4 4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÜNNE, Markus Enscheder Strasse 11 48691 Vreden / DE | 02 /
ARTES, Harold Im Obstgarten 6 A-4100 Ottensheim / AT | 03 /
SCHAHPAR, Michael Fraunhoferweg 7 A-4030 Linz / AT | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 13747828.5 | 06.08.2013 | [2016/24] | WO2013EP66463 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015018437 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030943 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030943 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
G05D1/0274 (EP,US);
A47L9/2894 (US);
A47L9/2805 (US);
A47L2201/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | G05D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES BODENREINIGUNGSGERÄTES UND BODENREINIGUNGSGERÄT | [2016/24] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A FLOOR-CLEANING DEVICE AND FLOOR-CLEANING DEVICE | [2016/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DE SOL ET APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DE SOL | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 22.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20200113.7 / EP3822730 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2013 | AL | 07.10.2020 | CY | 07.10.2020 | CZ | 07.10.2020 | DK | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | ES | 07.10.2020 | FI | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | IT | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MK | 07.10.2020 | NL | 07.10.2020 | PL | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | RS | 07.10.2020 | SE | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | SM | 07.10.2020 | TR | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | NO | 07.01.2021 | GR | 08.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | PT | 08.02.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.08.2013 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
MK | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 06.08.2013 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 06.08.2013 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 07.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]JP2002085305 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [I] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [I]KR20040003089 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO) [I] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [I]KR20050012118 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO) [I] 1-28* the whole document *; | [I]KR100730311B (ACEROBOT CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [I] - HYUNJIN KIM ET AL, "USER-CENTERED APPROACH TO PATH PLANNING OF CLEANING ROBOTS: ANALYZING USER'S CLEANING BEHAVIOR", ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, (20070308), XP040057714 [I] 1-28 * the whole document * | Examination | US2005171636 | US2012109376 | by applicant | US6667592 | WO2009132317 |