EP2880314 - DEVICE FOR CAPILLARY TRANSPORT OF LIQUIDS, USE AND METHOD OF THE PRODUCTION OF SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/24] | DEVICE FOR THE CAPILLARY TRANSPORT OF LIQUIDS, USE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A DEVICE | ||
[2016/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Baumgartner, Werner, Prof. Wildberg 29 4202 Kirchschlag bei Linz / AT | For all designated states Comanns, Philipp Melatener Strasse 89 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Baumgartner, Werner Lommergasse 4 52156 Monschau / DE | |||
For all designated states Comanns, Philipp Melatener Strasse 89 52074 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMANNS, Philipp Melatener Str. 89 52074 Aachen / DE | 02 /
BAUMGARTNER, Werner, Prof. Wildberg 29 4202 Kirchschlag bei Linz / AT | 03 /
BERNHARDT, Frank Am Alten Bahndamm 4 52072 Aachen / DE | 04 /
WINANDS, Kai Welkenrather Str. 118 c 52074 Aachen / DE | 05 /
ARNTZ, Kristian Martin-Luther-King-Str. 22 52146 Würselen / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2015/42] | 01 /
COMANNS, Philipp Melatener Str. 89 52074 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
BAUMGARTNER, Werner Wildberg 29 4202 Kirchschlag bei Linz / AT | |||
03 /
BERNHARDT, Frank Am Alten Bahndamm 4 52072 Aachen / DE | |||
04 /
WINANDS, Kai Welkenrather Str. 118 c 52074 Aachen / DE | |||
05 /
ARNTZ, Kristian Martin-Luther-King-Str. 22 52146 Würselen / DE | |||
Former [2015/24] | 01 /
COMANNS, Philipp Melatener Str. 89 52074 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
BAUMGARTNER, Werner Lommersgasse 4 52156 Monschau / DE | |||
03 /
BERNHARDT, Frank Am Alten Bahndamm 4 52072 Aachen / DE | |||
04 /
WINANDS, Kai Welkenrather Str. 118 c 52074 Aachen / DE | |||
05 /
ARNTZ, Kristian Martin-Luther-King-Str. 22 52146 Würselen / DE | Representative(s) | Naeven, Ralf König Naeven Schmetz Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Eupener Straße 2a 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Naeven, Ralf König & Naeven Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Kackertstraße 10 52072 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2015/24] | Naeven, Ralf König & Naeven Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Kackertstraße 10 DE-52072 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13747957.2 | 28.06.2013 | [2016/39] | WO2013DE100234 | Priority number, date | DE20121012884 | 28.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012012884 | DE20121021603 | 06.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012021603 | [2015/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014000735 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880314 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2880314 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2880314 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F04F7/00, F04B19/00 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
F04B19/006 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (US);
F04F7/00 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0406 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KAPILLAREN TRANSPORT VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN, VERWENDUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2015/24] | English: | DEVICE FOR CAPILLARY TRANSPORT OF LIQUIDS, USE AND METHOD OF THE PRODUCTION OF SUCH A DEVICE | [2016/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT PAR CAPILLARITÉ DE LIQUIDES, UTILISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2016/19] |
Former [2015/24] | DEVICE FOR THE CAPILLARY TRANSPORT OF LIQUIDS, USE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A DEVICE | ||
Former [2015/24] | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT CAPILLAIRE DE LIQUIDES, UTILISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 20.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.11.2016 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2013 | AL | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | MT | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | IE | 28.06.2017 | LU | 28.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | Examination | - Philipp Comanns ET AL, "Moisture harvesting and water transport through specialized micro-structures on the integument of lizards", Beilstein journal of nanotechnology, Germany, doi:10.3762/bjnano.2.24, (20110101), pages 204 - 214, URL: file:///C:\Users\NF21809\AppData\Roaming\Mozilla\Firefox\Profiles\NF21809\CiteNPLTemp\CiteNPLWebPage.pdf, (20160314), XP055258023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3762/bjnano.2.24 |