Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9611318 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2017 | B2 | US2015197562 | 16.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP66086 | 31.07.2013 | US201314418677 | 31.07.2013 | US201261679380 | 03.08.2012 | EP12179315 | 03.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2692357 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12179315 | 03.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2879706 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2017 | B1 | EP2879706 | 10.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13748000 | 31.07.2013 | WO2013EP66086 | 31.07.2013 | US201261679380 | 03.08.2012 | EP12179315 | 03.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014020062 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261679380 | 03.08.2012 | EP12179315 | 03.08.2012 |