EP2879637 - DIAPER STRUCTURE WITH ENHANCED TACTILE SOFTNESS ATTRIBUTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Han One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
FERRER, John One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2020/34] |
Former [2015/24] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 13748183.4 | 30.07.2013 | [2020/34] | WO2013US52676 | Priority number, date | US201261678163P | 01.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261678163 P | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014022362 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879637 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2879637 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/513, A61F13/514 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
A61F13/513 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61F13/531 (US);
A61F13/51456 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/51476 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/51478 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/538 (US);
A61L15/24 (US);
A61F2013/15406 (US);
A61F2013/51078 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/51338 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/51452 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/530481 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/5383 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDELSTRUKTUR MIT ATTRIBUTEN ZUR VERBESSERTEN WEICHHEIT BEIM BERÜHREN | [2020/12] | English: | DIAPER STRUCTURE WITH ENHANCED TACTILE SOFTNESS ATTRIBUTES | [2015/24] | French: | STRUCTURE DE COUCHE AVEC DES ATTRIBUTS POUR UNE SOUPLESSE TACTILE AMELIORÉE | [2020/12] |
Former [2015/24] | WINDELSTRUKTUR MIT VERBESSERTER TAKTILER WEICHHEIT | ||
Former [2015/24] | STRUCTURE DE COUCHE AVEC ATTRIBUTS DE DOUCEUR TACTILE AMÉLIORÉS | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 21.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2013 | AL | 19.08.2020 | AT | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | DK | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | ES | 19.08.2020 | FI | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | MT | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SE | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | TR | 19.08.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | NO | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 30.07.2013 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
TR | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.07.2013 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 30.07.2013 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 30.07.2013 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 19.08.2020 | |
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003065295 (MALCHOW GREGORY LYNN [US], et al); | [XDI]US2009118689 (LAWSON KATHLEEN MARIE [US], et al) | by applicant | US3860003 | US4940464 | US5037416 | US5092861 | US5151092 | US5246433 | US5266392 | US5269775 | US5370764 | WO9516746 | US5554145 | US5569234 | US5571096 | US5607760 | US5635191 | US5643588 | WO9824391 | US5897545 | US5957908 | US6004306 | US6120487 | US6120489 | WO0069481 | WO02064877 | US2002143304 | US2003077307 | US6632385 | US6645569 | EP1369518 | US2003233082 | US2004131820 | US2004175343 | US6803103 | US6861571 | US6863933 | US2005159720 | US2006057921 | US7112621 | WO2007097467 | US2007275622 | US2008306463 | WO2009021473 | WO2009060384 | US7744576 | US7750203 | US7789870 | US7858544 | US2012094567 | US20030338603 | US20030338610 | US20040758066 | US20080141122 |