EP2816161 - POPUP INSTALLATION STRUCTURE FOR A SINK AND INSTALLATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daeuntech Inc. 105-503 76 Suwan-ro 33beon-gil Gwangsan-gu Gwangju 506-304 / KR | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Hyun Suk 1208-2 Hyoja-dong 2-ga Wansan-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 560-801 / KR | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [2014/52] | Application number, filing date | 13748617.1 | 30.01.2013 | WO2013KR00734 | Priority number, date | KR20120014445 | 13.02.2012 Original published format: KR 20120014445 | [2014/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013122341 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816161 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/23, E03C1/22, A47K1/14 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
E03C1/23 (EP,KR,US);
E03C1/232 (US);
A47K1/14 (KR);
E03C1/22 (KR);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | POPUP-INSTALLATIONSSTRUKTUR FÜR EINE SPÜLE UND INSTALLATIONSVERFAHREN | [2014/52] | English: | POPUP INSTALLATION STRUCTURE FOR A SINK AND INSTALLATION METHOD | [2014/52] | French: | STRUCTURE D'INSTALLATION ESCAMOTABLE POUR ÉVIER ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2014 | Translation filed | 29.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 28.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20100010923U (HER, YONG); | [A]EP1696080 (MCALPINE & CO LTD [GB]); | [A]KR200437279Y (WATOS COREA CO., LTD.); | [A]US2008178382 (PINETTE THOMAS C [US], et al) | by applicant | KR200441759Y |