EP2814464 - THERMOSENSITIVE NANOPARTICLE FORMULATIONS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celsion Corporation 997 Lenox Drive Suite 100 Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED, Robert, A. 1327 Hilltown Pike Line Lexington, PA 18932 / US | 02 /
SU, Daishui 8754 F Town Country Boulevard Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Ledl, Andreas Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Ledl, Andreas Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/52] | Ledl, Andreas Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13748684.1 | 15.02.2013 | [2019/51] | WO2013US26453 | Priority number, date | US201261600418P | 17.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261600418 P | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013123407 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814464 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2814464 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (US);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
A61K9/1278 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHE NANOPARTIKELFORMULIERUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/52] | English: | THERMOSENSITIVE NANOPARTICLE FORMULATIONS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [2014/52] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE NANOPARTICULES THERMOSENSIBLES ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2013 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | LU | 15.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.02.2013 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2012104277 (NANOBIOTIX [FR], et al) [XP] 1-23 * page 15, paragraphs 2-3 * * examples 3,4 *; | [X]WO2011109334 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0204] , [0221] , [0222] , [0223] , [0227]; figures 9-11,15,16; example 6 *; | [XY]WO2007024826 (CELSION CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,23 * example 1 * [Y] 7-22; | [Y] - HARAN G. ET AL., "Transmembrane ammonium sulfate gradients in liposomes produce efficient and stable entrapment of amphipathic weak bases", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1993), vol. 1151, pages 201 - 215, XP002740222 [Y] 7-22 * tables I,II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2736(93)90105-9 | International search | [X]US6726925 (NEEDHAM DAVID [US]); | [Y]US2006222694 (OH CHOON K [US], et al); | [Y]US2001033861 (LASIC DANILO D [US], et al); | [Y]US2007269502 (PLIURA DIANA H [CA], et al); | [Y]US5008380 (PALLADINO GAETANO [IT], et al); | [Y]US2008261913 (SOMMADOSSI JEAN-PIERRE [US], et al) | Examination | - DE SMET M. ET AL., "Temperature-sensitive liposomes for doxorubicin delivery under MRI guidance", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2010), vol. 143, pages 120 - 127, XP026964330 |