EP2875249 - DUAL CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIENSCHEIN, Stephan Röderswaldweg 22a 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | 02 /
KRAUSE, Thorsten Im Grün 57a 77815 Bühl / DE | [2015/22] | Application number, filing date | 13750628.3 | 17.07.2013 | WO2013DE200059 | Priority number, date | DE201210212807 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012212807 | DE201210215919 | 07.09.2012 Original published format: DE102012215919 | DE201310208051 | 02.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013208051 | [2015/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012542 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875249 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16D21/06, F16D25/08, F16D25/10 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
F16D21/06 (EP);
F16D25/087 (EP);
F16D25/10 (EP);
F16D2021/0615 (EP);
F16D2021/0661 (EP);
F16D2021/0692 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | DOPPELKUPPLUNG | [2015/22] | English: | DUAL CLUTCH | [2015/22] | French: | EMBRAYAGE DOUBLE | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 20.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |