EP2912281 - RUB TOLERANT FAN CASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSEN, Michael, Edward One Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 02 /
PAULEY, Gerald, Alexander One Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 03 /
SCORSE, Daniel, Thomas One Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | Williams, Andrew Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13750773.7 | 01.08.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013US53190 | Priority number, date | US201213604722 | 06.09.2012 Original published format: US201213604722 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014039188 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912281 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/04, F01D25/24 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
F01D21/045 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Title | German: | ABRIEBFESTES VENTILATORGEHÄUSE | [2015/36] | English: | RUB TOLERANT FAN CASE | [2015/36] | French: | BOÎTIER DE VENTILATEUR TOLÉRANT VIS-À-VIS DU FROTTEMENT | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 06.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 14.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP2290199 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-14,17-19 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * [Y] 5,6,10,15,16,20; | [XY]GB2112349 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [X] 1-3,9,11-13,19 * page 2, lines 89-124 * * page 3, lines 50-82; figure 2; claims 22-29 * [Y] 4-8,10,14-18; | [XY]US4534698 (TOMICH MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1-3,11-13,19 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 62; figures 1,2; claims 1, 4-7 * [Y] 4-8,10,14-18,20; | [Y]US2009226310 (FINN SCOTT ROGER [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,10,15,20 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] , [0 25] , [0 29] , [0 30]; figures 1-4; claims 1-6 * |