|
06.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
42 |