EP2817965 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ACCESSING CAMERA SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elwha LLC 3150 139th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98005-4046 / US | [2015/38] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Elwha LLC 3150 129th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98005-4046 / US | ||
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Elwha LLC 11235 SE 6th Street Suite 200 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNCAN, William David 15825 Village Green Drive Unit 16 Mill Creek, WA 98012 / US | 02 /
WOOD, JR., Lowell, L. 989 112th Avenue NE 2310 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | 03 /
HYDE, Roderick, A. 9915 - 161st Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
ISHIKAWA, Muriel, Y. 1185 Hillcrest Avenue Livermore, CA 94550-4921 / US | 05 /
WEAVER, Thomas, Allan 101 Arroyo Court 8 San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 06 /
KARE, Jordin, T. 908 15th Avenue East Seattle, WA 98112 / US | [2015/11] |
Former [2015/01] | 01 /
DUNCAN, William, David 12204 NE 109th Way Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | ||
02 /
WOOD, JR., Lowell, L. 989 112th Avenue NE 2310 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | |||
03 /
HYDE, Roderick, A. 9915 - 161st Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
04 /
ISHIKAWA, Muriel, Y. 1185 Hillcrest Avenue Livermore, CA 94550-4921 / US | |||
05 /
WEAVER, Thomas, Allan 101 Arroyo Court 8 San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | |||
06 /
KARE, Jordin, T. 908 15th Avenue East Seattle, WA 98112 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13751292.7 | 22.02.2013 | WO2013US27453 | Priority number, date | US201213402744 | 22.02.2012 Original published format: US201213402744 | US201213402737 | 22.02.2012 Original published format: US201213402737 | US201213402740 | 22.02.2012 Original published format: US201213402740 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013126790 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817965 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, G06Q30/08 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
H04N7/18 (EP);
G06Q30/0283 (EP);
G06Q30/08 (EP);
H04N7/185 (EP);
H04N23/661 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN ZUGRIFF AUF KAMERASYSTEME | [2015/01] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ACCESSING CAMERA SYSTEMS | [2015/01] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ACCÉDER À DES SYSTÈMES DE CAMÉRAS | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 18.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/49] | 31.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2018 | 10.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0188811 (INVISIBLE HAND NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 2,3 * page 4, line 9 - page 6, line 23 ** figure 1 *; | [XI]US2007021058 (ARSENEAU MARC [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,12 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0182] - paragraph [0183] * [I] 2,3,5-11,13-15; | [X]US2009009605 (ORTIZ LUIS M [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0080] * * figures 1-9 * | International search | [Y]US6085152 (DOERFEL STEVE [US]); | [Y]US2003101124 (SEMRET NEMO [US], et al); | [Y]US6741655 (CHANG SHIH-FU [US], et al); | [Y]US2007115358 (MCCORMACK KENNETH [US]); | [Y]US2008162481 (SADJADI SHAHROKH [US]); | [Y]US2009327286 (GE XIANPING [US], et al); | [Y]US2010013927 (NIXON STUART WILLIAM [AU]); | [Y]US2011109618 (NOWAK WOJCIECH TOMASZ [PL], et al); | [X]US2011187865 (FELT MICHELLE [US], et al); | [Y]US2011197241 (CREAMER ROB [US], et al) |