Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9537110 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2017 | B2 | US2015014673 | 15.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP54223 | 20.02.2013 | JP2012036201 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101656763B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2016 | B1 | KR20140125407 | 28.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP54223 | 20.02.2013 | JP2012036201 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5867583B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2016 | B2 | JPWO2013125599 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP54223 | 20.02.2013 | JP2014500745 | 20.02.2013 | JP2012036201 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104125951B | Global Dossier | 24.05.2017 | B | CN104125951 | 29.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP54223 | 20.02.2013 | JP2012036201 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2818464 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2015 | A4 | EP2818464 | 31.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP54223 | 20.02.2013 | JP2012036201 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013125599 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012036201 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI583676B | 21.05.2017 | B | TW201341375 | 16.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012036201 | 22.02.2012 |