EP2817277 - AZEOTROPIC COMPOSITIONS OF 1,1,1,3,3-PENTACHLOROPROPANE AND HYDROGEN FLUORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2024/21] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | ||
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERKEL, Daniel C. Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
TUNG, Hsueh Sung Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
POKROVSKI, Konstantin A. Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 04 /
PHAM, Hang T. Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 05 /
HULSE, Ryan Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Stepney, Gregory John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/21] |
Former [2015/01] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13751842.9 | 13.02.2013 | [2024/21] | WO2013US25892 | Priority number, date | US201213402983 | 23.02.2012 Original published format: US201213402983 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013126255 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817277 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2817277 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/01, C01B7/19, C09K3/00 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
C07C19/01 (EP,US);
C07C17/383 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AZEOTROPE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS 1,1,1,3,3-PENTACHLORPROPAN UND FLUORWASSERSTOFF | [2015/01] | English: | AZEOTROPIC COMPOSITIONS OF 1,1,1,3,3-PENTACHLOROPROPANE AND HYDROGEN FLUORIDE | [2015/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AZÉOTROPIQUES DE 1,1,1,3,3-PENTACHLORO-PROPANE ET DE FLUORURE D'HYDROGÈNE | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 23.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23216914.4 / EP4353800 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6759381 (JOHNSON ROBERT C [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US6023004 (THENAPPAN ALAGAPPAN [US], et al); | [A]US6328907 (NAKADA TATSUO [JP], et al); | [A]US2005080302 (BAKER RALPH THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]US7265082 (PHAM HANG T [US], et al); | [A]US2008033219 (LAMBERT ALAIN [BE], et al); | [Y]US2010113323 (TUNG HSUEH S [US], et al); | [A]US8075797 (HULSE RYAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US5763706 | US6759381 | US6844475 | US2011201853 |