EP2817757 - CONTENT ACTIVATION VIA INTERACTION-BASED AUTHENTICATION, SYSTEMS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nant Holdings IP LLC 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOON-SHIONG, Patrick 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/01] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13752027.6 | 08.02.2013 | [2017/23] | WO2013US25366 | Priority number, date | US201261603049P | 24.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261603049 P | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013126221 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817757 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2817757 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/30, G06F9/44, G06F3/00, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/10, G06F21/34, H04L29/06, G06F9/455, G06F21/10, G06F21/35 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0207 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/30 (KR);
H04L63/08 (US);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/35 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/00 (KR);
G06F9/44 (KR);
G06F9/45533 (US);
G06Q30/02 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/41] | G06F21/30, G06F9/44, G06F3/00, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/10, G06F21/34, H04L29/06, G06F9/455 | ||
Former IPC [2015/01] | G06F21/30, G06F9/44, G06F3/00, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALTSAKTIVIERUNG ÜBER INTERAKTIONSBASIERTE AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2015/01] | English: | CONTENT ACTIVATION VIA INTERACTION-BASED AUTHENTICATION, SYSTEMS AND METHOD | [2015/01] | French: | ACTIVATION DE CONTENU PAR LE BIAIS D'UNE AUTHENTIFICATION BASÉE SUR L'INTERACTION, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉ | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17174182.0 / EP3239878 | EP18186219.4 / EP3413222 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2013 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | IT | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | NL | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | RS | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | LU | 08.02.2018 | MT | 08.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.02.2013 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
MT | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.02.2013 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
MT | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
MT | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
MT | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009106788 (NOCHIMOWSKI ALAIN [FR]); | [I]US2011161232 (BROWN KERRY D [US]) | International search | [A]US2006002607 (BONCYK WAYNE C [US], et al); | [A]US2006080316 (GILMORE ALAN R [GB], et al); | [A]KR20090014878 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2009106788 (NOCHIMOWSKI ALAIN [FR]); | [A]KR20110068545 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]EP2348458 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | by applicant | US7380280 | US2009106788 | US7953079 | US2011161232 | WO2012085378 |