EP2817774 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MAKING PAYMENTS AND RECEIVING REBATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mesika, Eyal 54 Leon Blum St 58373 Holon / IL | For all designated states Mesika, Yehuda 54 Leon Blum St 58373 Holon / IL | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKLER, Yair 50 Dizengoff St 18th Fl. 64332 Tel Aviv / IL | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2015/01] | Application number, filing date | 13752378.3 | 24.02.2013 | WO2013IL00022 | Priority number, date | US201261602166P | 23.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261602166 P | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013124840 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817774 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 29.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, H04W64/00, G06Q50/00, G06Q30/02 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0234 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | G06Q30/00, H04W64/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON ZAHLUNGEN UND ZUM EMPFANGEN VON RÜCKZAHLUNGEN | [2015/01] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MAKING PAYMENTS AND RECEIVING REBATES | [2015/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DESTINÉS À EFFECTUER DES PAIEMENTS ET À RECEVOIR DES REMBOURSEMENTS | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 18.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2011028160 (ROEDING CYRIAC [US], et al) |