EP2890466 - METHOD FOR TRANSFORMING A THREE DIMENSIONAL DIGITAL MODEL IN A SPACE OBJECT MADE OF SHEET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Todorov, Krasimir, Chavdarov 9 Prezviter Kozma Str. 1421 Sofia / BG | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Neykov, Neyko Hristov 58, Vorino Str. app. 2 1680 Sofia / BG | Application number, filing date | 13753257.8 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013BG00031 | Priority number, date | BG20120111248 | 02.07.2012 Original published format: BG 11124812 | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014005202 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890466 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/12, G09F1/06 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
B29C64/386 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
A63F9/1288 (EP,KR,US);
B42D15/008 (KR);
B44C3/025 (EP,US);
B44C3/06 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G06F30/00 (US);
G06T17/20 (KR);
G09F1/06 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2009/1292 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2009/1296 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y50/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN DIGITALEN MODELLS IN EINEN RAUMGEGENSTAND AUS BLATTMATERIAL | [2015/28] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSFORMING A THREE DIMENSIONAL DIGITAL MODEL IN A SPACE OBJECT MADE OF SHEET MATERIAL | [2015/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFORMATION D'UN MODÈLE NUMÉRIQUE TRIDIMENSIONNEL DANS UN OBJET ESPACE CONSTITUÉ D'UN MATÉRIAU SOUS FORME DE FEUILLE | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 07.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 02.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/18] | 07.04.2017 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 13.12.2017 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request rejected | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 26.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 26.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 26.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5806853 (DRUCKMAN GIL [IL], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 55; figure - *; | [XD]WO03084622 (TODOROV KRASIMIR CHAVDAROV [BG]) [XD] 1 * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 17; figure - *; | [X]AU2003268854 (CHUANG SHIH HUNG [TW]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 10; figure - *; | [X]US2009127785 (KISHON DANIEL CHAIM [GB]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0032] - paragraph [0046]; figure - *; | [A]CN201832406U (JERUEL IND COMPANY LTD) [A] 1* abstract * |