EP2896124 - ASSEMBLY WITH A MULTILAYER ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENES, Istvan Im Raisger 3 71336 Waiblinge/Hohenacker / DE | [2015/30] | Application number, filing date | 13753633.0 | 28.08.2013 | [2017/17] | WO2013EP67808 | Priority number, date | DE201210216564 | 17.09.2012 Original published format: DE102012216564 | [2015/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014040860 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896124 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896124 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02N2/04, F04B43/04 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
F04B43/04 (EP,US);
F04B43/025 (EP,US);
H02N1/006 (US);
H02N2/043 (EP,US);
H10N30/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | H02N2/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AGGREGAT MIT VIELSCHICHTAKTOR | [2015/30] | English: | ASSEMBLY WITH A MULTILAYER ACTUATOR | [2015/30] | French: | GROUPE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN ACTIONNEUR MULTICOUCHES | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Request for further processing for: | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2016 | Decision despatched | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2013 | AL | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | IT | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | MT | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | GB | 28.08.2017 | IE | 28.08.2017 | LU | 28.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | FR | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 26.04.2017 | |
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE19525087 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [XAI]DE19647752 (HOPF ROLF [DE]); | [XAY]DE19730052 (HOPF ROLF [DE]); | [YA]US6463982 (DOAN PAUL GEORGE [US]); | [XAY]DE10358818 (IAV GMBH [DE]); | [XA]US2007164641 (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al); | [YA]US2007251474 (GAUTHIER DANIEL G [US], et al) |