EP2888692 - EXCEPTION HANDLING IN A DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS HAVING A SECURE DOMAIN AND A LESS SECURE DOMAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | [2018/49] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROCUTT, Thomas Christopher c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 9NJ / GB | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2015/27] | Berryman, Robert Jan D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13753677.7 | 07.08.2013 | [2018/49] | WO2013GB52108 | Priority number, date | GB20120017531 | 01.10.2012 Original published format: GB 201217531 | US201213680298 | 19.11.2012 Original published format: US201213680298 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014053804 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888692 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2888692 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/74, G06F21/52, G06F9/38 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G06F9/3861 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/52 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/30123 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/3013 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/461 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/4812 (EP,CN,US);
G06F12/1491 (US);
G06F21/74 (US);
G06F2209/481 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | G06F21/52, G06F9/38, G06F9/46, G06F9/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSNAHMENVERWALTUNG IN EINER DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SICHEREN BEREICH UND EINEM WENIGER SICHEREN BEREICH | [2015/27] | English: | EXCEPTION HANDLING IN A DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS HAVING A SECURE DOMAIN AND A LESS SECURE DOMAIN | [2015/27] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'EXCEPTION DANS UN APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES COMPORTANT UN DOMAINE SÉCURISÉ ET UN DOMAINE MOINS SÉCURISÉ | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 23.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2013 | AL | 05.12.2018 | AT | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | ES | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | HR | 05.12.2018 | IT | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | LV | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | MK | 05.12.2018 | MT | 05.12.2018 | NL | 05.12.2018 | PL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | RS | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | SM | 05.12.2018 | TR | 05.12.2018 | BG | 05.03.2019 | NO | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | IE | 07.08.2019 | LU | 07.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.08.2013 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.08.2013 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | |
NO | 05.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6363474 (MCCULLEY LOWELL [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011225402 (GRISENTHWAITE RICHARD ROY [GB]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Cortex-M3 Technical Reference Manual", (20060101), pages 5 - 1, URL: http://infocenter.arm.com/help/topic/com.arm.doc.ddi0337e/DDI0337E_cortex_m3_r1p1_trm.pdf, (20130919), XP055080004 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * |