EP2819697 - ANTIBODIES TO MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE 9 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Biologics, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMKEWICZ, Joanne I. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Victoria 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
THAI, Zung 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 04 /
HAWKINS, Michael J. 550 Davis Street, 14 San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13754254.4 | 28.02.2013 | WO2013US28456 | Priority number, date | WO2012US27160 | 29.02.2012 Original published format: PCT/US2012/027160 | US201261605181P | 29.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261605181 P | US201361755444P | 22.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361755444 P | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013130905 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2819697 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/40, C12N9/64, A61K39/395 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/02] | A61K39/395, A61K38/17, A61K38/16, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | 26.09.2014 | ME | 26.09.2014 | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN MATRIX-METALLOPROTEINASE-9 | [2015/02] | English: | ANTIBODIES TO MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE 9 | [2015/02] | French: | ANTICORPS DIRIGÉS CONTRE LA MÉTALLOPROTÉINASE 9 DE MATRICE | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 02.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | EP17168528.2 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007094842 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-10 * seq ID 413;; claims 1-115 * * in particular * * abstract * * figure 11A; sequence 413 *; | [X]WO2008154439 (IRM LLC, et al) [X] 1,3,4,9,10 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * claim 4; sequence 59 *; | [X]WO2009111450 (DYAX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * page 1, line 14 - page 12, line 21 * * figures 1-10; examples 1-16; claims 1-53 *; | [A]WO2010059543 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * page 239; sequence 250 *; | [XP]WO2012027721 (GILEAD BIOLOGICS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-10* Mouse AB0041;; claims 1-23 *; | [Y] - HOLT L J ET AL, "Domain antibodies: proteins for therapy", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20031101), vol. 21, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2003.08.007, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 484 - 490, XP004467495 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2003.08.007 | [Y] - DAVIES J ET AL, "Affinity improvement of single antibody VH domains: residues in all three hypervariable regions affect antigen binding", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (19960901), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S1380-2933(96)00045-0, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 169 - 179, XP004070292 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(96)00045-0 | [A] - CARTER P J, "POTENT ANTIBODY THERAPEUTICS BY DESIGN", NATURE REVIEWS. IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20060407), vol. 6, doi:10.1038/NRI1837, ISSN 1474-1733, pages 343 - 357, XP007901440 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri1837 | [A] - WARK K L ET AL, "Latest technologies for the enhancement of antibody affinity", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 58, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2006.01.025, ISSN 0169-409X, (20060807), pages 657 - 670, (20060807), XP024892147 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2006.01.025 | International search | [A]US2009208510 (SAGI IRIT [IL], et al); | [A]US2009311245 (DEVY LAETITIA [US], et al); | [A] - MARTENS, E. ET AL., "A monoclonal antibody inhibits gelatinase B/MMP-9 by selective binding to part of the catalytic domain and not to the fibronectin or zinc binding domains", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2007), vol. 1770, pages 178 - 186, XP005818408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbagen.2006.10.012 | [A] - HU, J. ET AL., "Inhibitors of gelatinase B/matrix metalloproteinase-9 activity comparison of a peptidomimetic and polyhistidine with single-chain derivatives of a neutralizing monoclonal antibody", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2004), vol. 67, pages 1001 - 1009, XP055042352 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2003.10.030 |