EP2820638 - AIDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 31.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ablecon AS Romsveien 330 3179 Åsgårdstrand / NO | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALVENES, Arnfinn Romsveien 330 N-3179 Åsgård / NO | 02 /
EDWIN, Egil Hvitsteinbakken 5 N-3080 Holmestrand / NO | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Protector IP AS Pilestredet 33 0166 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Protector IP Consultants AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 13755063.8 | 22.02.2013 | WO2013NO50035 | Priority number, date | NO20120000207 | 27.02.2012 Original published format: NO 20120207 | [2015/02] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013129934 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820638 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 06.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09B5/06, G09B5/08, H04N1/00 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G09B21/008 (EP,NO,US);
G02B27/027 (NO,US);
H04N23/80 (US);
H04N23/60 (NO);
H04N23/631 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | HILFSSYSTEM | [2015/02] | English: | AIDING SYSTEM | [2015/02] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/40] | 30.08.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2018 | 16.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9921122 (ASCENT TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [Y]US2002191071 (RUI YONG [US], et al); | [XI]DE102010015977 (WALDNER LABOR UND SCHULEINRICHTUNGEN GMBH [DE]) | International search | [Y]WO9921122 (ASCENT TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [Y]US2002191071 (RUI YONG [US], et al); | [X]DE102010015977 (WALDNER LABOR UND SCHULEINRICHTUNGEN GMBH [DE]) |