EP2821270 - POWERTRAIN FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE COMPRISING A TRANSAXLE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/02] | TRANSAXLE SYSTEM FOR HYBRID VEHICLE | ||
[2017/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DATE, Hiromasa c/o MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13755118.0 | 30.01.2013 | [2018/12] | WO2013JP51989 | Priority number, date | JP20120046532 | 02.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012046532 | [2015/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013129011 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2821270 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2821270 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/442, B60K6/40, B60K6/387 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/42 (KR);
B60K6/40 (EP,CN,US);
F16D25/12 (US);
B60K17/04 (KR);
B60K6/442 (EP,KR,US);
B60K6/50 (KR);
B60K2006/4808 (EP,US);
F16D25/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/02] | B60K6/40, B60K6/387, B60K6/442, B60K17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDANTRIEBSSTRANG UMFASSEND EINE TRANSAXLE-EINHEIT | [2017/42] | English: | POWERTRAIN FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE COMPRISING A TRANSAXLE UNIT | [2017/42] | French: | CHAÎNE D'ÊNTRAÎNEMENT POUR VÉHICULE HYBRIDE COMPRENANT UNE BOÎTE DE RÉPARTITION DE PUISSANCE | [2017/42] |
Former [2015/02] | TRANSAXIALES SYSTEM FÜR EIN HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2015/02] | TRANSAXLE SYSTEM FOR HYBRID VEHICLE | ||
Former [2015/02] | SYSTÈME DE BOÎTE-PONT POUR VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2014 | Translation filed | 29.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 11.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2013 | AL | 21.03.2018 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | HR | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MK | 21.03.2018 | NL | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | RS | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | NO | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.01.2013 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
IS | 21.07.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
IS | 21.07.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1142744 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* figure - *; | [A]US2008076616 (KIDOKORO TERUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]JP2010076678 (AISIN AW CO) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2000127774 (KYOWA GOKIN KK); | [A]JP2000326739 (KYOWA GOKIN KK); | [A]JP2002199506 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2003307270 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2010195338 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2009128288 |