EP2820028 - A PROCESS FOR PREPARING PURE CITICOLINE (CDP-CHOLINE) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Change - priority | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frichem Private Limited 12 Concord Bullock Road Band Stand Bandra West Mumbai 400 050 / IN | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Rajiv Fact 337 Kerala Nalsarovar Road Vill.: Kerala Tal.: Bavla Dist.: Ahmedabad 382220 / IN | 02 /
CHAUHAN, Yogendra Fact 337 Kerala Nalsarovar Road Vill.: Kerala Tal.: Bavla Dist.: Ahmedabad 382220 / IN | 03 /
DHAKE, Vilas Fact 337 Kerala Nalsarovar Road Vill.: Kerala Tal.: Bavla Dist.: Ahmedabad 382220 / IN | 04 /
TAMBE, Vijay Fact 337 Kerala Nalsarovar Road Vill.: Kerala Tal.: Bavla Dist.: Ahmedabad 382220 / IN | 05 /
WAGH, Atul Fact 337 Kerala Nalsarovar Road Vill.: Kerala Tal.: Bavla Dist.: Ahmedabad 382220 / IN | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 13755755.9 | 28.02.2013 | WO2013IB51585 | Priority number, date | IN2012MUM540 | 28.02.2012 Original published format: IN 540MU2012 | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/02] | INMM05402012 | 28.02.2012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013128393 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820028 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 06.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/10, C07H1/00 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
C07H19/10 (EP);
C07H1/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/02] | C07H19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REINEM CITICOLIN (CDP-CHOLIN) | [2015/02] | English: | A PROCESS FOR PREPARING PURE CITICOLINE (CDP-CHOLINE) | [2015/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CITICOLINE PURE (CDP-CHOLINE) | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 25.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2015 | 29.02.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3787392 (BERGMEYER H ET AL) [AD] 1-8 * column 5; example 4 *; | [A]CN102010454 (JIANRONG HU) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [A]US3666748 ((MSKK) HONJO, YOSHSYASU FURHKAWA)); | [A]US3787392 (BERGMEYER H.DT, HAID E,DT. NELBOECK HOCHSTETTER M,DT, WEIMANN G,DT); | JPS4720170B [ ] (AJMOMOTO CO., INC.); | JPS4729915B [ ] (WAKAMOTO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.); | [A] - CAPLUS, ACS, (2013), Database accession no. 1973:30154, XP003033857 | [A] - CAPLUS, ACS, (2013), Database accession no. 1972:540475, XP003033859 | [A] - CAPLUS, ACS, (20130719), Database accession no. 1956:89744, XP003033858 | [ ] - KENNEDY, EUGENE P. ET AL., "The synthesis of cytidine diphosphate choline, cytidine diphosphate ethanolamine and related compounds", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1956), vol. 222, pages 185 - 191 |