EP2823068 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DETERMINING VIRUS SUSCEPTIBILITY TO NON-NUCLEOSIDE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings 358 South Main Street Burlington, North Carolina 27215 / US | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADDAD, Mojgan 80 Muth Drive Orinda California 94523 / US | 02 /
PETROPOULOS, Christos John 415 Garcia Avenue Half Moon Bay California 94019 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Donald, Jenny Susan Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Donald, Jenny Susan Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13755770.8 | 04.03.2013 | WO2013US28878 | Priority number, date | US201261606362P | 02.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261606362 P | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013131087 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2823068 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
C12Q1/703 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER VIRENANFÄLLIGKEIT FÜR NICHTNUCLEOSIDISCHE REVERSE-TRANSKRIPTASE-HEMMER | [2015/03] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DETERMINING VIRUS SUSCEPTIBILITY TO NON-NUCLEOSIDE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITORS | [2015/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LA DÉTERMINATION DE LA SENSIBILITÉ D'UN VIRUS VIS-À-VIS D'INHIBITEURS DE TRANSCRIPTASE INVERSE NON NUCLÉOSIDES | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0222781 (VIROLOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5, line 21 - line 23 * * page 14, line 2 - line 14 * * page 20, line 5 - line 9 * * page 22, line 17 - line 20 * * page 85, line 22 - line 31 * [Y] 3-6,8-13; | [XY]WO2009061856 (SALK INSTITUITE FOR BIOLOG STU [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 12, line 9 - line 15 * * page 15, line 9 - line 24 * * page 80, line 29 - page 81, line 3; claims 45-47 * [Y] 3-6,8-13; | [XY] - TOSSONIAN H K ET AL, "Primary drug resistance in antiretroviral-naive injection drug users", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR INFECTIOUS DISEASES, HAMILTON, CA, vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.IJID.2008.08.028, ISSN 1201-9712, (20090901), pages 577 - 583, (20090824), XP026502293 [X] 1,2,7,14,15 * abstract * [Y] 3-6,8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijid.2008.08.028 | International search | [X]US2004063191 (HUANG WEI [US], et al); | [A]US2006094020 (PARKIN NEIL T [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010130731 (VIRCO BVBA [BE], et al); | [A] - ESHLEMAN ET AL., "Phenotypic drug resistance patterns in subtype A HIV-1 clones with nonnucleoside reverse transcriptase resistance mutations", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, (20060301), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 289 - 293, XP055160870 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/aid.2006.22.289 | [A] - HINKLEY ET AL., "A systems analysis of mutational effects in HIV-1 protease and reverse transcriptase", NATURE GENETICS, (20110327), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 487 - 490, XP055160872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.795 |