EP2888182 - A CAPSULE FOR USE IN A FOOD PREPARATION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TALON, Christian Chemin des Vignes 22C CH-1134 Vufflens-le-Château / CH | 02 /
ODET, Samuel 55, Avenue Louis-Ruchonnet CH-1003 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
DENISART, Jean-Luc Ch. du Vigny 2 CH-1096 Cully / CH | [2017/41] |
Former [2015/27] | 01 /
TALON, Christian Chemin des Vignes 22C CH-1134 Vufflens-le-Château / CH | ||
02 /
ODET, Samuel 35 rue du Simplon CH-1800 Vevey / CH | |||
03 /
DENISART, Jean-Luc Ch. du Vigny 2 CH-1096 Cully / CH | Representative(s) | Schuller, Cornelis, et al Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Schuller, Cornelis, et al Nestec S.A. Centre de Recherche Nestlé Vers-chez-les-Blanc Case Postale 44 1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | Application number, filing date | 13756024.9 | 21.08.2013 | [2017/40] | WO2013EP67381 | Priority number, date | EP20120181655 | 24.08.2012 Original published format: EP 12181655 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014029803 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888182 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2888182 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/804, A47J31/36, A47J31/44 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
B65D85/8046 (EP,RU,US);
A47J31/36 (US);
A47J31/3623 (EP,US);
A47J31/4492 (EP,US);
B65D85/8043 (EP,RU,US);
B65D85/804 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPSEL ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER LEBENSMITTELZUBEREITUNGSMASCHINE | [2017/13] | English: | A CAPSULE FOR USE IN A FOOD PREPARATION MACHINE | [2015/27] | French: | CAPSULE À UTILISER DANS UNE MACHINE DE PRÉPARATION D'ALIMENTS | [2017/13] |
Former [2015/27] | KAPSEL ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER LEBENSMITTELHERSTELLUNGSMASCHINE | ||
Former [2015/27] | CAPSULE DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UNE MACHINE DE PRÉPARATION D'ALIMENT | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Request for further processing for: | 16.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 04.10.2017 | |
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | HR | 04.10.2017 | |
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 04.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1654966 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-14 * [A] 3-5,7-15; | [XA]WO2010137953 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * page 8; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-5,7-15; | [XA]WO2010066705 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * page 25; figures 1-14 * [A] 3-5,7-15; | [A]EP1864917 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011069829 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2236264 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1472156 | EP1784344 | CH605293 | EP0242556 | EP2162653 | EP1967100 | EP2062831 | EP20110178061 |