EP2890615 - BOX FOR THE PACKAGING AND/OR DISPENSING OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cacciatore, Jean Nouvelle Route 16 4837 Bilstain / BE | For all designated states Piron, David Rue du Vieux Chaffour 5 4841 Henri Chapelle / BE | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIRON, David Rue du Vieux Chaffour 5 B-4841 Henri Chapelle / BE | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | Application number, filing date | 13756143.7 | 30.08.2013 | WO2013EP68016 | Priority number, date | BE20120000569 | 31.08.2012 Original published format: BE 201200569 | [2015/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014033271 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890615 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/02, B65D83/08, B65D5/42 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
B65D5/0254 (EP);
B65D5/4258 (EP);
B65D83/0805 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER ZUM VERPACKEN UND/ODER AUSGEBEN VON PRODUKTEN | [2015/28] | English: | BOX FOR THE PACKAGING AND/OR DISPENSING OF PRODUCTS | [2015/28] | French: | BOITE POUR EMBALLAGE ET/OU DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUITS | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 12.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 31.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2006111232 (PIRON DAVID [FR]) [XD] 13,15 * page 3, line 6 - line 29; figure 3 *; | [IY]FR1194771 (ANDRES ALCAZAR) [I] 1,2,4,5,7-9,12,14 * figures 2, 5 * [Y] 3,6,10; | [Y]CH272731 (BURREN RUDOLF [CH]) [Y] 3,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR780427 (DALBERA) [Y] 10 * page 1, line 47 - line 60; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3851809 (MCKIBBIN J) [A] 1 * figures 2-5 *; | [A]WO2009070678 (CLEVER INNOVATIONS CONCEPTS LL [US], et al) [A] 11 * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2006111232 |