|
09.12.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
620 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
620 |
|
19.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
620 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
620 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
277 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
277 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Published international application - A4 |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.07.2014 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
495 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
628 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
603 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
527 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
464 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
633 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
281 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
235 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |