Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007095093 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2008 | A3 | WO2007095093 | 23.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007092637 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007092637 | 16.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007092624 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007092624 | 16.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | WO2007US03587 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007092618 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007092618 | 16.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024277919 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US202418636455 | 16.04.2024 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201715595304 | 15.05.2017 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US202117338726 | 04.06.2021 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US201314075076 | 08.11.2013 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US98128310 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024197984 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201113011384 | 21.01.2011 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201414507484 | 06.10.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US202418430832 | 02.02.2024 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US202117185074 | 25.02.2021 | US201715633178 | 26.06.2017 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024195058 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64663009 | 23.12.2009 | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US202418430814 | 02.02.2024 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US201414550128 | 21.11.2014 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US202217876903 | 29.07.2022 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024108546 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201313788785 | 07.03.2013 | US202318230351 | 04.08.2023 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US201615284030 | 03.10.2016 | US202117177691 | 17.02.2021 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US202217866906 | 18.07.2022 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024066214 | Global Dossier | 29.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117227892 | 12.04.2021 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US202318502236 | 06.11.2023 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024051691 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815961238 | 24.04.2018 | US202117387453 | 28.07.2021 | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US202318380357 | 16.10.2023 | US201762489157 | 24.04.2017 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024042127 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815871571 | 15.01.2018 | US202318225229 | 24.07.2023 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201414336530 | 21.07.2014 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | US56010609 | 15.09.2009 | US202016998741 | 20.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023382572 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815961238 | 24.04.2018 | US202318222581 | 17.07.2023 | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US202117306069 | 03.05.2021 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201916393270 | 24.04.2019 | US201762489154 | 24.04.2017 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | US201862662018 | 24.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023372606 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213372164 | 13.02.2012 | US202217682450 | 28.02.2022 | US202318341032 | 26.06.2023 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201815953786 | 16.04.2018 | US201514679796 | 06.04.2015 | US202017097596 | 13.11.2020 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023330324 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514840610 | 31.08.2015 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US201213346369 | 09.01.2012 | US202117222170 | 05.04.2021 | US202318341006 | 26.06.2023 | US2923408 | 11.02.2008 | US201816197773 | 21.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023277416 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201816164378 | 18.10.2018 | US202318144577 | 08.05.2023 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US98123410 | 29.12.2010 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US201414537040 | 10.11.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US202117521161 | 08.11.2021 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023233756 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US98135010 | 29.12.2010 | US201314138535 | 23.12.2013 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US202318097770 | 17.01.2023 | US201816003783 | 08.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023226273 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016901085 | 15.06.2020 | US202318100052 | 23.01.2023 | US201615350759 | 14.11.2016 | US201815905272 | 26.02.2018 | US39522709 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023226271 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US202218084650 | 20.12.2022 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201916259615 | 28.01.2019 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023181890 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US202218079470 | 12.12.2022 | WO2013US29641 | 07.03.2013 | US201414383345 | 05.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023147049 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414323636 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | US202217967229 | 17.10.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023104329 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916393191 | 24.04.2019 | US202218079487 | 12.12.2022 | US201862662018 | 24.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023070580 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39512809 | 27.02.2009 | US201816237234 | 31.12.2018 | US201615082578 | 28.03.2016 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US202217986185 | 14.11.2022 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022401641 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US202217843136 | 17.06.2022 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US64987809 | 30.12.2009 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201715837661 | 11.12.2017 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022379013 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US56010209 | 15.09.2009 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US201816025591 | 02.07.2018 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | US202217871345 | 22.07.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022280715 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217748419 | 19.05.2022 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201916371813 | 01.04.2019 | US39518509 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US201615155694 | 16.05.2016 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022265918 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US202217733037 | 29.04.2022 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201313953183 | 29.07.2013 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201514886865 | 19.10.2015 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US201916397042 | 29.04.2019 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022211937 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US202217703313 | 24.03.2022 | US201615388341 | 22.12.2016 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021396221 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615350733 | 14.11.2016 | US202117466092 | 03.09.2021 | US62616609 | 25.11.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201313942051 | 15.07.2013 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US201815864539 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021393939 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US202117240415 | 26.04.2021 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201313788280 | 07.03.2013 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021393870 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US98135010 | 29.12.2010 | US201314138535 | 23.12.2013 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US202117202791 | 16.03.2021 | US201816003783 | 08.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021338926 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US202117377633 | 16.07.2021 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201313858569 | 08.04.2013 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201815894304 | 12.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021228798 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201313946506 | 19.07.2013 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US202117170107 | 08.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021190063 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US42945109 | 24.04.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US202117196081 | 09.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020407086 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US202017020727 | 14.09.2020 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020303748 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762489157 | 24.04.2017 | WO2018US28840 | 23.04.2018 | US201816607260 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020276386 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US202016876992 | 18.05.2020 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US39503609 | 27.02.2009 | US201715489144 | 17.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020261645 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016866063 | 04.05.2020 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39519309 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019262552 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514872676 | 01.10.2015 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US201916407796 | 09.05.2019 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019201638 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213667326 | 02.11.2012 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US39509809 | 27.02.2009 | US201916298565 | 11.03.2019 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US201615043094 | 12.02.2016 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018193629 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201414323571 | 03.07.2014 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US201313788260 | 07.03.2013 | US201815912011 | 05.03.2018 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US98128310 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9861769 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | B2 | US2017056585 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615350733 | 14.11.2016 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US62616609 | 25.11.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US201313942051 | 15.07.2013 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9901689 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2018 | B2 | US2017056578 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615350759 | 14.11.2016 | US39522709 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9907903 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2016206808 | 21.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615082535 | 28.03.2016 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39525809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9943653 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2018 | B2 | US2016184514 | 30.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US201615062808 | 07.03.2016 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US72313510 | 12.03.2010 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9943652 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2018 | B2 | US2015273141 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213372164 | 13.02.2012 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201514679796 | 06.04.2015 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9687602 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | B2 | US2015231329 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201113011384 | 21.01.2011 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US72231305 | 29.09.2005 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201414507484 | 06.10.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9907943 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2015165114 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201414323571 | 03.07.2014 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US201313788260 | 07.03.2013 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US98128310 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9617020 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2017 | B2 | US2015151857 | 04.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9867930 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2018 | B2 | US2015045767 | 12.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201414336530 | 21.07.2014 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | US56010609 | 15.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9993600 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2018 | B2 | US2014350459 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US98135010 | 29.12.2010 | US201314138535 | 23.12.2013 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9492614 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2014221929 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US60918809 | 30.10.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US201414249037 | 09.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014207067 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414221979 | 21.03.2014 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US61386409 | 06.11.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9895499 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2018 | B2 | US2014194816 | 10.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313975770 | 26.08.2013 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US39521509 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9649433 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2014142498 | 22.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201314075076 | 08.11.2013 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US98128310 | 29.12.2010 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9724461 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2017 | B2 | US2014114282 | 24.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314138962 | 23.12.2013 | US39516809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9456955 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2016 | B2 | US2014048174 | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201313788785 | 07.03.2013 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9162027 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2015 | B2 | US2014046260 | 13.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201313953183 | 29.07.2013 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9033922 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2015 | B2 | US2014039395 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201113157952 | 10.06.2011 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314047553 | 07.10.2013 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9017286 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2015 | B2 | US2014025001 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314042163 | 30.09.2013 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9492613 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2013303991 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US62616609 | 25.11.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US201313942051 | 15.07.2013 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9259531 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2016 | B2 | US2013300565 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213667326 | 02.11.2012 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US39509809 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9931461 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2018 | B2 | US2013281974 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US2798908 | 12.02.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201313858569 | 08.04.2013 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9248233 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2016 | B2 | US2013231608 | 05.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313858542 | 08.04.2013 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9278174 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2016 | B2 | US2012209244 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US72313510 | 12.03.2010 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9265879 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2016 | B2 | US2012209240 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42961209 | 24.04.2009 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8617107 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2013 | B2 | US2012209239 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39516809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8702656 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2014 | B2 | US2012209219 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US60918809 | 30.10.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8679073 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2014 | B2 | US2012209217 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US61386409 | 06.11.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8486018 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2013 | B2 | US2012209209 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62616609 | 25.11.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8518000 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2013 | B2 | US2012209207 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US39521509 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9295779 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2016 | B2 | US2012209199 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39512809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9498587 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2016 | B2 | US2012209198 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US42959009 | 24.04.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8435214 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2013 | B2 | US2012209191 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US39528409 | 27.02.2009 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9339603 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2016 | B2 | US2012209190 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US39518509 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8303574 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2012 | B2 | US2012209189 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US39509809 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9492612 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2012209188 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39522709 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9033921 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2015 | B2 | US2012209187 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US39494409 | 27.02.2009 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8551052 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2013 | B2 | US2012209184 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201113157952 | 10.06.2011 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012209182 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US42945109 | 24.04.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012209181 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US39533909 | 27.02.2009 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9295780 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2016 | B2 | US2012209180 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39525809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9623198 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2012209179 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US39503609 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9931479 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2018 | B2 | US2012204996 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US60915709 | 30.10.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8579884 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2013 | B2 | US2012203177 | 09.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US98128310 | 29.12.2010 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8998850 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2015 | B2 | US2012150115 | 14.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213372164 | 13.02.2012 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9119913 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2015 | B2 | US2012109062 | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US201213346369 | 09.01.2012 | US2923408 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011306931 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201113190127 | 25.07.2011 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8852164 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2014 | B2 | US2011300001 | 08.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201113011384 | 21.01.2011 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8613724 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2013 | B2 | US2011190694 | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US98135010 | 29.12.2010 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8881774 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2014 | B2 | US2011186177 | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US98123410 | 29.12.2010 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9492606 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2011144574 | 16.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | US83719310 | 15.07.2010 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9839743 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2017 | B2 | US2010198183 | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US64987809 | 30.12.2009 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8900188 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2014 | B2 | US2010191186 | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64663009 | 23.12.2009 | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8784364 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2014 | B2 | US2010185142 | 22.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | US56010609 | 15.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8414563 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2013 | B2 | US2009299289 | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US2798908 | 12.02.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8491570 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2013 | B2 | US2009299277 | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US2798908 | 12.02.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9526830 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2016 | B2 | US2009281497 | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US2798908 | 12.02.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8496646 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2013 | B2 | US2009275896 | 05.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008195045 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US2923408 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8414522 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2013 | B2 | US2007228071 | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8113244 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2012 | B2 | US2007219597 | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | WO2007US03587 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8585377 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2013 | B2 | US2007219496 | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8545445 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2013 | B2 | US2007219480 | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7756687 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2010 | B2 | US2007072317 | 29.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72231305 | 29.09.2005 | US53674006 | 29.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12070574 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2024 | B2 | US2023082342 | 16.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201615350768 | 14.11.2016 | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | US83719310 | 15.07.2010 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US202217897982 | 29.08.2022 | US201916691022 | 21.11.2019 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12064590 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2024 | B2 | US2020353158 | 12.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815911970 | 05.03.2018 | US201615082535 | 28.03.2016 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39525809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US202016939339 | 27.07.2020 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12036387 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2024 | B2 | US2023226274 | 20.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514872676 | 01.10.2015 | US201916407839 | 09.05.2019 | US202318126599 | 27.03.2023 | US202117174762 | 12.02.2021 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12012241 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2024 | B2 | US2023312147 | 05.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117523379 | 10.11.2021 | US202318117741 | 06.03.2023 | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US202017020727 | 14.09.2020 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11992650 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2024 | B2 | US2012209185 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US39514809 | 27.02.2009 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11964126 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2024 | B2 | US2021361858 | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201314075076 | 08.11.2013 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US201715595304 | 15.05.2017 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US98128310 | 29.12.2010 | US202117338726 | 04.06.2021 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11904134 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2024 | B2 | US2021008279 | 14.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715669385 | 04.08.2017 | US201314138962 | 23.12.2013 | US39516809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US202017027117 | 21.09.2020 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11894609 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | B2 | US2023029035 | 26.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64663009 | 23.12.2009 | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US201414550128 | 21.11.2014 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US202217876903 | 29.07.2022 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11890448 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | B2 | US2021283329 | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201113011384 | 21.01.2011 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201414507484 | 06.10.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US202117185074 | 25.02.2021 | US201715633178 | 26.06.2017 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11844926 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2023 | B2 | US2021270255 | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61790309 | 13.11.2009 | US201816126639 | 10.09.2018 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US202117140261 | 04.01.2021 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11813427 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B2 | US2022275796 | 01.09.2022 | A9 | US2021231116 | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117227892 | 12.04.2021 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11787576 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2023 | B2 | US2022024617 | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815961238 | 24.04.2018 | US202117387453 | 28.07.2021 | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201762489157 | 24.04.2017 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11786651 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2023 | B2 | US2021293232 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514715031 | 18.05.2015 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201113157952 | 10.06.2011 | US202017107880 | 30.11.2020 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314047553 | 07.10.2013 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11738139 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2023 | B2 | US2021180583 | 17.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816160384 | 15.10.2018 | US42961209 | 24.04.2009 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US202016939342 | 27.07.2020 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201615048693 | 19.02.2016 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11723841 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2023 | B2 | US2022387260 | 08.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201313788785 | 07.03.2013 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US201615284030 | 03.10.2016 | US202117177691 | 17.02.2021 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US202217866906 | 18.07.2022 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11717609 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2023 | B2 | US2022249769 | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213372164 | 13.02.2012 | US202217682450 | 28.02.2022 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201815953786 | 16.04.2018 | US201514679796 | 06.04.2015 | US202017097596 | 13.11.2020 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11717606 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2023 | B2 | US2021220549 | 22.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US201514840610 | 31.08.2015 | US201213346369 | 09.01.2012 | US202117222170 | 05.04.2021 | US2923408 | 11.02.2008 | US201816197773 | 21.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11712513 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2023 | B2 | US2020345931 | 05.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313975770 | 26.08.2013 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US39521509 | 27.02.2009 | US202016933405 | 20.07.2020 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201815897577 | 15.02.2018 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11707567 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2023 | B2 | US2021170097 | 10.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815871571 | 15.01.2018 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201414336530 | 21.07.2014 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | US56010609 | 15.09.2009 | US202016998741 | 20.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11702233 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2023 | B2 | US2022002009 | 06.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815961238 | 24.04.2018 | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US202117306069 | 03.05.2021 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201916393270 | 24.04.2019 | US201762489154 | 24.04.2017 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | US201862662018 | 24.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11701300 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2023 | B2 | US2022054357 | 24.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201816164378 | 18.10.2018 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US202117466090 | 03.09.2021 | US98123410 | 29.12.2010 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US201414537040 | 10.11.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11690952 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2023 | B2 | US2020338262 | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016927174 | 13.07.2020 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201113089927 | 19.04.2011 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11642283 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2023 | B2 | US2022054358 | 24.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201816164378 | 18.10.2018 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US98123410 | 29.12.2010 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US201414537040 | 10.11.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US202117521161 | 08.11.2021 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11617826 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2023 | B2 | US2017065765 | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US42959009 | 24.04.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US201615357112 | 21.11.2016 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11612688 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2023 | B2 | US2021180584 | 17.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514872676 | 01.10.2015 | US201916407839 | 09.05.2019 | US202117174762 | 12.02.2021 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11597541 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2023 | B2 | US2022063847 | 03.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117523379 | 10.11.2021 | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US202017020727 | 14.09.2020 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11596732 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2023 | B2 | US2019365992 | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313858542 | 08.04.2013 | US201916543929 | 19.08.2019 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US201615012007 | 01.02.2016 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11559625 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2023 | B2 | US2020306446 | 01.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016901085 | 15.06.2020 | US201615350759 | 14.11.2016 | US201815905272 | 26.02.2018 | US39522709 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11554208 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2023 | B2 | US2018289900 | 11.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US98135010 | 29.12.2010 | US201314138535 | 23.12.2013 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US201816003783 | 08.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11534543 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2022 | B2 | US2019336681 | 07.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514715054 | 18.05.2015 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US39494409 | 27.02.2009 | US201916459007 | 01.07.2019 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11534542 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2022 | B2 | US2019388609 | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201916259615 | 28.01.2019 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11524151 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2022 | B2 | US2015051571 | 19.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314383345 | 07.03.2013 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | WO2013US29641 | 07.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11523972 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2022 | B2 | US2019321260 | 24.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916393191 | 24.04.2019 | US201862662018 | 24.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11497846 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2022 | B2 | US2019134297 | 09.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39512809 | 27.02.2009 | US201816237234 | 31.12.2018 | US201615082578 | 28.03.2016 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11497686 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2022 | B2 | US2021393484 | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201313788785 | 07.03.2013 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US202117213615 | 26.03.2021 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201414323604 | 03.07.2014 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US201816137083 | 20.09.2018 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11491273 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2022 | B2 | US2019099560 | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61790309 | 13.11.2009 | US201816126639 | 10.09.2018 | US201816192213 | 15.11.2018 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11478623 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B2 | US2014107579 | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US201313788260 | 07.03.2013 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US98128310 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11471594 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2022 | B2 | US2015174320 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414323636 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11426512 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2022 | B2 | US2020086042 | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201615350768 | 14.11.2016 | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | US83719310 | 15.07.2010 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201916691022 | 21.11.2019 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11413391 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2022 | B2 | US2019269862 | 05.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US201916417012 | 20.05.2019 | US39500009 | 27.02.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11408414 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2022 | B2 | US2013249687 | 26.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201313888014 | 06.05.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US39528409 | 27.02.2009 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11406753 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2022 | B2 | US2012209204 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113069051 | 22.03.2011 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11404776 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2022 | B2 | US2015303563 | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64663009 | 23.12.2009 | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US201414550128 | 21.11.2014 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11395877 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | B2 | US2019175822 | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US56010209 | 15.09.2009 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US201816025591 | 02.07.2018 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11391273 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2022 | B2 | US2019224411 | 25.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615350606 | 14.11.2016 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201916371828 | 01.04.2019 | US60918809 | 30.10.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US201414249037 | 09.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11389377 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2022 | B2 | US2021170100 | 10.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201313788785 | 07.03.2013 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US201615284030 | 03.10.2016 | US202117177691 | 17.02.2021 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11364335 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2022 | B2 | US2019083698 | 21.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US64987809 | 30.12.2009 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201715837661 | 11.12.2017 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11357910 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2022 | B2 | US2019046720 | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201313858569 | 08.04.2013 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201815894304 | 12.02.2018 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11339774 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | B2 | US2019224410 | 25.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201916371813 | 01.04.2019 | US39518509 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US201615155694 | 16.05.2016 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11318249 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2022 | B2 | US2019298914 | 03.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201313953183 | 29.07.2013 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201514886865 | 19.10.2015 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US201916397042 | 29.04.2019 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11293425 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2019307970 | 10.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514697000 | 27.04.2015 | US201314042163 | 30.09.2013 | US201916449696 | 24.06.2019 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11286921 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2022 | B2 | US2012209183 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42946409 | 24.04.2009 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11285259 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2022 | B2 | US2017136178 | 18.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US201615388341 | 22.12.2016 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11261858 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B2 | US2021060241 | 04.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213372164 | 13.02.2012 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201815953786 | 16.04.2018 | US201514679796 | 06.04.2015 | US202017097596 | 13.11.2020 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11166877 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2021 | B2 | US2019046405 | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201816164378 | 18.10.2018 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US98123410 | 29.12.2010 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US201414537040 | 10.11.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11136972 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2021 | B2 | US2018221595 | 09.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815941732 | 30.03.2018 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US60915709 | 30.10.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11136971 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2021 | B2 | US2018126097 | 10.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615350733 | 14.11.2016 | US62616609 | 25.11.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201313942051 | 15.07.2013 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US201815864539 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11077965 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2021 | B2 | US2018237174 | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815961238 | 24.04.2018 | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201762489157 | 24.04.2017 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11027058 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2021 | B2 | US2017246383 | 31.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201314075076 | 08.11.2013 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US201715595304 | 15.05.2017 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US98128310 | 29.12.2010 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10995742 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2021 | B2 | US2019262554 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514872676 | 01.10.2015 | US201916407839 | 09.05.2019 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10994871 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2021 | B2 | US2019248518 | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815961238 | 24.04.2018 | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201916393270 | 24.04.2019 | US201762489154 | 24.04.2017 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | US201862662018 | 24.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10987505 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2021 | B2 | US2014054883 | 27.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201313788280 | 07.03.2013 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10975854 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2021 | B2 | US2014074029 | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10967117 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2021 | B2 | US2019125960 | 02.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US201514840610 | 31.08.2015 | US201213346369 | 09.01.2012 | US2923408 | 11.02.2008 | US201816197773 | 21.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10959914 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2021 | B2 | US2019021954 | 24.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201313788785 | 07.03.2013 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201414323604 | 03.07.2014 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US201816137083 | 20.09.2018 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10933187 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2021 | B2 | US2017290976 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201113011384 | 21.01.2011 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201414507484 | 06.10.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US201715633178 | 26.06.2017 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10926030 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2021 | B2 | US2017239417 | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201313788785 | 07.03.2013 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US201615284030 | 03.10.2016 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10912882 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2021 | B2 | US2014031743 | 30.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US201313946506 | 19.07.2013 | US2798908 | 12.02.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10881790 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2021 | B2 | US2019022337 | 24.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61790309 | 13.11.2009 | US201816126639 | 10.09.2018 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10850029 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2020 | B2 | US2015250941 | 10.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514715031 | 18.05.2015 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201113157952 | 10.06.2011 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314047553 | 07.10.2013 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10835669 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2020 | B2 | US2019134317 | 09.05.2019 | A9 | US2018228985 | 16.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213372164 | 13.02.2012 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201815953786 | 16.04.2018 | US201514679796 | 06.04.2015 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10786624 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2020 | B2 | US2019262555 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514872676 | 01.10.2015 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201916407874 | 09.05.2019 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10780220 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2020 | B2 | US2017354778 | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715669385 | 04.08.2017 | US201314138962 | 23.12.2013 | US39516809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10773836 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2020 | B2 | US2017210496 | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715483490 | 10.04.2017 | US201414323672 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10751467 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2020 | B2 | US2018133394 | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815871571 | 15.01.2018 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201414336530 | 21.07.2014 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | US56010609 | 15.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10722647 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B2 | US2019046739 | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816160384 | 15.10.2018 | US42961209 | 24.04.2009 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201615048693 | 19.02.2016 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10722643 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B2 | US2018193553 | 12.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815911970 | 05.03.2018 | US201615082535 | 28.03.2016 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39525809 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10716893 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2020 | B2 | US2018169353 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313975770 | 26.08.2013 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US39521509 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US201815897577 | 15.02.2018 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10709838 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2020 | B2 | US2012209195 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201113089927 | 19.04.2011 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10682463 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | B2 | US2018185592 | 05.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615350759 | 14.11.2016 | US201815905272 | 26.02.2018 | US39522709 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10668210 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2020 | B2 | US2019262553 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514872676 | 01.10.2015 | US201916407805 | 09.05.2019 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10653833 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2020 | B2 | US2017216520 | 03.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US39503609 | 27.02.2009 | US201715489144 | 17.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10639418 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2020 | B2 | US2012209186 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39519309 | 27.02.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10485922 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2019 | B2 | US2017281860 | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201615350768 | 14.11.2016 | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | US83719310 | 15.07.2010 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10383999 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2019 | B2 | US2016144114 | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313858542 | 08.04.2013 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US201615012007 | 01.02.2016 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10369299 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2019 | B2 | US2016025544 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514872676 | 01.10.2015 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10335557 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2015246177 | 03.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514715054 | 18.05.2015 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US39494409 | 27.02.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10328215 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2019 | B2 | US2015224255 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314042163 | 30.09.2013 | US201514697000 | 27.04.2015 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10293117 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2019 | B2 | US2012209193 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US39500009 | 27.02.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10272195 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2019 | B2 | US2016038671 | 11.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US201313953183 | 29.07.2013 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798108 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201514886865 | 19.10.2015 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10245390 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2019 | B2 | US2017056584 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615350606 | 14.11.2016 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US60918809 | 30.10.2009 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US201414249037 | 09.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10245389 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2019 | B2 | US2016256627 | 08.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US39518509 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US201615155694 | 16.05.2016 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10232131 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2016022903 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514872761 | 01.10.2015 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US201314082579 | 18.11.2013 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10226587 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B2 | US2016158463 | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213667326 | 02.11.2012 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US39509809 | 27.02.2009 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US201615043094 | 12.02.2016 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10188787 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2010198182 | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10166329 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2019 | B2 | US2016206809 | 21.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US39512809 | 27.02.2009 | US201615082578 | 28.03.2016 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10137241 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2018 | B2 | US2016008537 | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US201514840610 | 31.08.2015 | US201213346369 | 09.01.2012 | US2923408 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10105286 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | B2 | US2015283031 | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US98123410 | 29.12.2010 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US201414537040 | 10.11.2014 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10099018 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2018 | B2 | US2016166764 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42961209 | 24.04.2009 | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US201615048693 | 19.02.2016 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10080704 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2018 | B2 | US2015157537 | 11.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US201313788785 | 07.03.2013 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US34798208 | 31.12.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US34798508 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US201414323604 | 03.07.2014 | US201261607848 | 07.03.2012 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10071210 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2018 | B2 | US2012209178 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61790309 | 13.11.2009 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10010669 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2018 | B2 | US2010185175 | 22.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US70489607 | 09.02.2007 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US70489707 | 09.02.2007 | US70488607 | 09.02.2007 | US70489907 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | US56010209 | 15.09.2009 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024113186 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | JP2020102345 | 12.06.2020 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | JP2022105839 | 30.06.2022 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024105665 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019067052 | 29.03.2019 | JP2022074411 | 28.04.2022 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | JP2021101470 | 18.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024102353 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | JP2020140690 | 24.08.2020 | JP2022086769 | 27.05.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024099819 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020166931 | 01.10.2020 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | JP2022180185 | 10.11.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023156507 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019111066 | 14.06.2019 | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | JP2021128789 | 05.08.2021 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023156445 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020020567 | 10.02.2020 | JP2021164532 | 06.10.2021 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023154064 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021125154 | 30.07.2021 | JP2019190851 | 18.10.2019 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023037013 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | JP2022173344 | 28.10.2022 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023011918 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020166931 | 01.10.2020 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7535088B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2024 | B2 | JP2022187020 | 15.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | JP2020167726 | 02.10.2020 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022126862 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | JP2020102345 | 12.06.2020 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022110158 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | JP2020140690 | 24.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7548962B | Global Dossier | 10.09.2024 | B2 | JP2022110157 | 28.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | JP2020140690 | 24.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022105123 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019067052 | 29.03.2019 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | JP2021101470 | 18.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022002741 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020020567 | 10.02.2020 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7219322B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2023 | B2 | JP2022001291 | 06.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020020567 | 10.02.2020 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021183152 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019190851 | 18.10.2019 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021176597 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019111066 | 14.06.2019 | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7161581B | Global Dossier | 26.10.2022 | B2 | JP2021142370 | 24.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019067052 | 29.03.2019 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021003604 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021000527 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7150793B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | B2 | JP2021000526 | 07.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020192388 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020179217 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020142153 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7069246B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2022 | B2 | JP2020121174 | 13.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020096889 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6908745B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | B2 | JP2020096888 | 25.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018133020 | 13.07.2018 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020022789 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019115750 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019107516 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019030735 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019013794 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018171505 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018167128 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7032220B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2022 | B2 | JP2018122142 | 09.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018122141 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017221755 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017148542 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017136435 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017077494 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017029768 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017029766 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6434009B | Global Dossier | 05.12.2018 | B2 | JP2016526454 | 05.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45430 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6189390B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | B2 | JP2016019865 | 04.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6254956B | Global Dossier | 27.12.2017 | B2 | JP2015512690 | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | WO2013US29562 | 07.03.2013 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015198972 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6367155B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | B2 | JP2015198955 | 12.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015180319 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6301287B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2018 | B2 | JP2015180318 | 15.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015123374 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015083215 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6484404B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2019 | B2 | JP2014168695 | 18.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014166574 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014140766 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6054899B | Global Dossier | 27.12.2016 | B2 | JP2014121641 | 03.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014000432 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5844280B | Global Dossier | 13.01.2016 | B2 | JP2013518204 | 20.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011US22073 | 21.01.2011 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5820391B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | B2 | JP2013516242 | 13.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | WO2010US62443 | 29.12.2010 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5807016B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2015 | B2 | JP2013516241 | 13.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | WO2010US62426 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5890787B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2016 | B2 | JP2013099579 | 23.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5876404B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | B2 | JP2013056205 | 28.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5770706B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2015 | B2 | JP2013056190 | 28.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5961111B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | JP2012533360 | 27.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | WO2010US42150 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6288903B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2018 | B2 | JP2012502693 | 02.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US56999 | 15.09.2009 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5634269B | Global Dossier | 03.12.2014 | B2 | JP2011508637 | 17.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010517700 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | WO2008US53594 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010179108 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010155091 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010155090 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010137061 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4969588B | Global Dossier | 04.07.2012 | B2 | JP2009525831 | 16.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5448460B | Global Dossier | 19.03.2014 | B2 | JP2009525828 | 16.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | WO2007US03587 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5137854B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2013 | B2 | JP2009525825 | 16.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5324923B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2013 | B2 | JP2009525822 | 16.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4309699 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2024 | A3 | EP4309699 | 24.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45436 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | EP14748013 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4151269 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18723323 | 24.04.2018 | WO2018US29122 | 24.04.2018 | US201762489154 | 24.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4059545 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414323604 | 03.07.2014 | US201414323571 | 03.07.2014 | EP15745615 | 02.07.2015 | WO2015US39026 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3974018 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | EP13757470 | 07.03.2013 | WO2013US29562 | 07.03.2013 | EP20155235 | 07.03.2013 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3881874 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US56999 | 15.09.2009 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | EP09809046 | 15.09.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3854442 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45430 | 03.07.2014 | EP14745278 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3784312 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US28929 | 24.04.2019 | US201862662018 | 24.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3777923 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | EP16197762 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | EP07750336 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3679969 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2020 | A3 | EP3679969 | 15.07.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | EP19184455 | 31.12.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US2798908 | 12.02.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | EP08869699 | 31.12.2008 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10107707 | 31.12.2007 | US10110507 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111507 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3662967 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | B1 | EP3662967 | 10.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | EP13757470 | 07.03.2013 | WO2013US29562 | 07.03.2013 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3615128 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2022 | B1 | EP3615128 | 04.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US29122 | 24.04.2018 | US201762489154 | 24.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3165247 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2020 | B1 | EP3165247 | 10.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | EP07750336 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3164171 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2022 | B1 | EP3164171 | 10.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414323604 | 03.07.2014 | US201414323571 | 03.07.2014 | WO2015US39026 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3085402 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2018 | B1 | EP3085402 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | EP10813059 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3016711 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2021 | B1 | EP3016711 | 11.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45430 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3016629 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | B1 | EP3016629 | 11.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45436 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2532377 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2016 | B1 | EP2532377 | 16.09.2015 | A3 | EP2532377 | 12.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | EP07750336 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2532376 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2019 | B1 | EP2532376 | 09.03.2016 | A3 | EP2532376 | 12.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | EP07750336 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2525848 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B1 | EP2525848 | 28.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US22073 | 21.01.2011 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2519288 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2016 | B1 | EP2519288 | 07.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | WO2010US62443 | 29.12.2010 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2519287 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2017 | B1 | EP2519287 | 07.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | WO2010US62426 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2453948 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2015 | B1 | EP2453948 | 23.05.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | WO2010US42150 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2382688 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2019 | B1 | EP2382688 | 02.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US69830 | 30.12.2009 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2381978 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2017 | B1 | EP2381978 | 02.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | WO2009US69491 | 23.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2361105 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | B1 | EP2361105 | 31.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US56999 | 15.09.2009 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2343094 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2013 | B1 | EP2343094 | 24.08.2011 | A3 | EP2343094 | 13.07.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07763498 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2338548 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2013 | B1 | EP2338548 | 24.08.2011 | A3 | EP2338548 | 29.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07763498 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2338547 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2013 | B1 | EP2338547 | 07.12.2011 | A3 | EP2338547 | 29.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07763498 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2335754 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | B1 | EP2335754 | 05.10.2011 | A3 | EP2335754 | 22.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07763303 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2324872 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2013 | B1 | EP2324872 | 05.10.2011 | A3 | EP2324872 | 25.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07763303 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2316504 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2019 | B1 | EP2316504 | 04.04.2012 | A3 | EP2316504 | 04.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | EP07750336 | 09.02.2007 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2311511 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2013 | B1 | EP2311511 | 05.10.2011 | A3 | EP2311511 | 20.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07763303 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2244765 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2019 | B1 | EP2244765 | 03.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US2798908 | 12.02.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2121077 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | WO2008US53594 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1993636 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | B2 | EP1993636 | 15.06.2011 | B1 | EP1993636 | 26.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | WO2007US03587 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1993635 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2011 | B1 | EP1993635 | 26.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1993634 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2011 | B1 | EP1993634 | 26.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1993633 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2016 | B1 | EP1993633 | 26.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106376233B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2019 | B | CN106376233 | 01.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45430 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104302350B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2018 | B | CN104302350 | 21.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | WO2013US29562 | 07.03.2013 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3197410 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2956895 | 02.07.2015 | US201414323604 | 03.07.2014 | US201414323571 | 03.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3132517 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2024 | C | CA3132517 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | CA3037726 | 15.09.2009 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3114586 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2023 | C | CA3114586 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA3035023 | 29.12.2010 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3098372 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US28929 | 24.04.2019 | US201862662018 | 24.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3064061 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US29122 | 24.04.2018 | US201762489154 | 24.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3059992 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | C | CA3059992 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2926975 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3037726 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2021 | C | CA3037726 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | CA2954728 | 15.09.2009 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3035023 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2021 | C | CA3035023 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2786044 | 29.12.2010 | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3033439 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2021 | C | CA3033439 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2787178 | 21.01.2011 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3017128 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2021 | C | CA3017128 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | CA2786258 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2956895 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2023 | C | CA2956895 | 07.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414323604 | 03.07.2014 | US201414323571 | 03.07.2014 | WO2015US39026 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2954728 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2019 | C | CA2954728 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | CA2738389 | 15.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2926975 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2019 | C | CA2926975 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2641583 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2919786 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2019 | C | CA2919786 | 16.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | CA2711244 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2914977 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2021 | C | CA2914977 | 08.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45436 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2914975 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | C | CA2914975 | 08.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45430 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2866624 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2022 | C | CA2866624 | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | WO2013US29562 | 07.03.2013 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2787178 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2019 | C | CA2787178 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US22073 | 21.01.2011 | US29750610 | 22.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2786258 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | C | CA2786258 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29164109 | 31.12.2009 | WO2010US62443 | 29.12.2010 | US29173309 | 31.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2786044 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | C | CA2786044 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | WO2010US62426 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2768011 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2018 | C | CA2768011 | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27090809 | 15.07.2009 | WO2010US42150 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2750634 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2017 | C | CA2750634 | 08.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US69830 | 30.12.2009 | US14204208 | 31.12.2008 | US22579409 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2750335 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | C | CA2750335 | 08.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | WO2009US69491 | 23.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2738389 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2017 | C | CA2738389 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US56999 | 15.09.2009 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2711244 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2016 | C | CA2711244 | 16.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US2798908 | 12.02.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US34798408 | 31.12.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2641583 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2016 | C | CA2641583 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | WO2007US03587 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2641569 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2015 | C | CA2641569 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008347241B | Global Dossier | 18.09.2014 | B2 | AU2008347241 | 16.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007215305B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2013 | B2 | AU2007215305 | 09.10.2008 | A2 | AU2007215305 | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007212275B | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | B2 | AU2007212275 | 20.11.2008 | A2 | AU2007212275 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | WO2007US03587 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007212269B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2013 | B2 | AU2007212269 | 25.09.2008 | A2 | AU2007212269 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007212192B | Global Dossier | 17.01.2013 | B2 | AU2007212192 | 25.09.2008 | A2 | AU2007212192 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2822640 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2020 | B1 | EP2822640 | 14.01.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | WO2013US29562 | 07.03.2013 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE504325T | 15.04.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE512682T | 15.07.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | WO2007US03587 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE524207T | 15.09.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122019016154 | 22.06.2021 | B8 | BR122019016154 | 23.02.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | BRPI0821466 | 31.12.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122020005551 | 10.08.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | BRPI0821466 | 31.12.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0707576 | 10.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0821466 | 22.06.2021 | B8 | BRPI0821466 | 11.08.2020 | B1 | BRPI0821466 | 16.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2641574 | 05.05.2015 | C | CA2641574 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2641643 | 14.10.2014 | C | CA2641643 | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2677667 | 14.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88900707 | 09.02.2007 | WO2008US53594 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3059311 | 16.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | CA2919786 | 31.12.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3130345 | 08.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2914977 | 03.07.2014 | US201361905533 | 18.11.2013 | US201361842553 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3148314 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA3059992 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3154910 | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | CA2866624 | 07.03.2013 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3183752 | 08.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2914975 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3210447 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64968109 | 30.12.2009 | CA3114586 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3213521 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA3148314 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3236573 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA3132517 | 15.09.2009 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US14199608 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US14178108 | 31.12.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US9702108 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101394878 | 25.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101394879B | 22.02.2012 | B | CN101394879 | 25.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101400391B | 12.02.2014 | B | CN101400391 | 01.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101405043B | 04.01.2012 | B | CN101405043 | 08.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101959547B | 26.11.2014 | B | CN101959547 | 26.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102512725B | 28.10.2015 | B | CN102512725 | 27.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780007335 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103736165B | 10.05.2017 | B | CN103736165 | 23.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | CN200780007307 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104162200B | 27.03.2018 | B | CN104162200 | 26.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780007306 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104162201 | 26.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104874047B | 28.05.2019 | B | CN104874047 | 02.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | CN200880127500 | 31.12.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105311705B | 07.06.2019 | B | CN105311705 | 10.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780007335 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107440681B | 17.08.2021 | B | CN107440681 | 08.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | CN200780007307 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108355194B | 12.02.2021 | B | CN108355194 | 03.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780007306 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109621078B | 27.05.2022 | B | CN109621078 | 16.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780007306 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110251769B | 01.04.2022 | B | CN110251769 | 20.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | CN200880127500 | 31.12.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110251773 | 20.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780007335 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112933332B | 06.09.2022 | B | CN112933332 | 11.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780007306 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114796703 | 29.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | CN200880127500 | 31.12.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602007013723D1 | 19.05.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX343851 | 24.11.2016 | B | MX2008010336 | 18.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03490 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008010340 | 18.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008010341 | 18.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03567 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | WO2007US03587 | 09.02.2007 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008010342 | 18.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010007324 | 30.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015017385 | 19.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US45430 | 03.07.2014 | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018015929 | 12.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020010594 | 28.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361842449 | 03.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX338464 | 15.04.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX343139 | 25.10.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2007US03634 | 09.02.2007 | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | US79318806 | 19.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX361885 | 18.12.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2447905 | 20.04.2012 | C2 | RU2008136190 | 20.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77231306 | 09.02.2006 | US78924306 | 05.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2510758 | 10.04.2014 | C2 | RU2010132226 | 10.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US1833907 | 31.12.2007 | US2364508 | 25.01.2008 | US10105308 | 29.09.2008 | US1800207 | 31.12.2007 | WO2008US88688 | 31.12.2008 | US10107708 | 29.09.2008 | US10110508 | 29.09.2008 | US1798907 | 31.12.2007 | US1804207 | 31.12.2007 | US10111508 | 29.09.2008 | US1805407 | 31.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019166406 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017164553 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY177292 | 10.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261668760 | 06.07.2012 | US201261607863 | 07.03.2012 | US201261736358 | 12.12.2012 | US201261667765 | 03.07.2012 | US201261737520 | 14.12.2012 | Type | Divisional application | EP3662967 | EP3974018 |