01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
04.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
21.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
01.06.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
23.04.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.12.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
06.07.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.03.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2017 |
First examination report |
|
25.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
11.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
11.03.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
27.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
03.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.12.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
02.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|