EP2824196 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PRESS-FORMED PRODUCT AND PRESS-FORMED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/03] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PRESS-FORMED PRODUCT AND PRESS-FORMED PRODUCT | ||
[2018/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Toshio c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
HATA, Hideo c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 03 /
NAITOU, Junya c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 04 /
OKITA, Keisuke c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 05 /
IKEDA, Shushi c/o Nagoya Branch Office Kobe Steel Ltd. 27-8, Meieki Minami 2-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya, Aichi 450-0003 / JP | [2018/27] |
Former [2015/03] | 01 /
MURAKAMI Toshio C/O Kobe Corporate Research Lab.in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | ||
02 /
HATA Hideo C/O Kobe Corporate Research Lab.in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
03 /
NAITOU Junya C/O Kobe Corporate Research Lab.in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
04 /
OKITA Keisuke C/O Kobe Corporate Research Lab.in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
05 /
IKEDA Shushi C/O Nagoya Branch Office in Kobe Steel Ltd. 27-8, Meieki Minami 2-chome, Nakamura-ku, Nagoya, Aichi 450-0003 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/27] |
Former [2015/03] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13757944.7 | 28.02.2013 | [2018/27] | WO2013JP55534 | Priority number, date | JP20120053847 | 09.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012053847 | [2015/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013133137 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2824196 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2824196 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/00, B21D22/20, C21D1/18, C22C38/00, C22C38/60, C21D9/46 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
C21D8/005 (EP,US);
B21D22/208 (EP,US);
B21D22/286 (EP,US);
C21D6/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,US);
C22C38/20 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
C22C38/32 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C22C38/54 (EP,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,US);
B62D29/007 (US);
C21D1/673 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PRESSGEFORMTEN PRODUKTS UND PRESSGEFORMTES PRODUKT | [2015/03] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PRESS-FORMED PRODUCT AND PRESS-FORMED PRODUCT | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT FAÇONNÉ À LA PRESSE ET PRODUIT FAÇONNÉ À LA PRESSE | [2015/03] |
Former [2015/03] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PRESS-FORMED PRODUCT AND PRESS-FORMED PRODUCT | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2014 | Translation filed | 18.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2013 | AL | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 04.11.2018 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | IE | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | LU | 28.02.2019 | MT | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.02.2013 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5595614 (MCVICKER JOSEPH E [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1642991 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2006212663 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007113100 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2008174813 (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2010043323 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2010174293 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011182765 (GIEFERS HUBERTUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A] - MIN JUNG KANG ET AL, "Analysis of Laser and Resistance Spot Weldments on Press-Hardened Steel", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, (20110701), vol. 695, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.695.202, pages 202 - 205, XP055253863 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.695.202 | [A] - H. KARBASIAN ET AL, "A review on hot stamping", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, (20101101), vol. 210, no. 15, doi:10.1016/j.jmatprotec.2010.07.019, ISSN 0924-0136, pages 2103 - 2118, XP055141086 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmatprotec.2010.07.019 | International search | [A]JP2002309345 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JP2006183139 (JFE STEEL KK); | [A]CN101280352 (CENTRAL IRON & STEEL RES INST [CN]); | [A]WO2009082091 (POSCO [KR], et al); | [A]JP2010065295 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2010174281 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [A]US2011182765 (GIEFERS HUBERTUS [DE], et al); | [A]JP2012001802 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [AP]WO2012169640 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP], et al); | [A] - HEPING LIU ET AL., "Enhanced mechanical properties of a hot stamped advanced high- strength steel treated by quenching an", SCRIPTA MATERIALIA, (201104), vol. 64, no. 8, pages 749 - 752, XP028360180 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.scriptamat.2010.12.037 | [A] - HEPING LIU ET AL., "Martensitic microstructural transformations from the hotstamping, quenching and partitioning process", MATERIALS CHARACTERIZATION, (201102), vol. 62, no. 2, pages 223 - 227, XP028132562 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchar.2010.12.003 | by applicant | JP2010065292 | JP2010065293 | JP2010065294 | JP2010065295 | - HIROSUE ET AL., NIPPON STEEL TECHNICAL REPORT, (2003), vol. 378, pages 15 - 20 | - ISJJ INT., (1933), vol. 33, no. 7, page 776 |