05.02.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
22.10.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.07.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2018 |
First examination report |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
02.09.2016 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
17.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.06.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
22.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
26.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
15.05.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
01.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.12.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
02.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|