Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9672619 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2017 | B2 | US2017039709 | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615331139 | 21.10.2016 | JP2012051559 | 08.03.2012 | US201414480570 | 08.09.2014 | JP2012113618 | 17.05.2012 | WO2013JP56273 | 07.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9547794 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2017 | B2 | US2014376792 | 25.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012051559 | 08.03.2012 | JP2012113618 | 17.05.2012 | WO2013JP56273 | 07.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5980567B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2016 | B2 | JP2013240361 | 05.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012113618 | 17.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5963480B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B2 | JP2013183912 | 19.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012051559 | 08.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106859578B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2018 | B | CN106859578 | 20.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012051559 | 08.03.2012 | CN201380012984 | 07.03.2013 | JP2012113618 | 17.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104203065B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B | CN104203065 | 10.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012051559 | 08.03.2012 | JP2012113618 | 17.05.2012 | WO2013JP56273 | 07.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2823749 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2016 | A4 | EP2823749 | 14.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012051559 | 08.03.2012 | JP2012113618 | 17.05.2012 | WO2013JP56273 | 07.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013133370 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012051559 | 08.03.2012 | JP2012113618 | 17.05.2012 |