EP2823749 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUZAKI, Hiroshi c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
YAGUCHI, Yoichi c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/03] | 01 /
MATSUZAKI, Hiroshi c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
YAGUCHI, Yoichi c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13758100.5 | 07.03.2013 | WO2013JP56273 | Priority number, date | JP20120051559 | 08.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012051559 | JP20120113618 | 17.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012113618 | [2015/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013133370 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2823749 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/04, G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/00009 (CN);
A61B1/041 (EP,CN,US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06V20/47 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | A61B1/00, A61B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/03] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2015/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROGRAMME, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2014 | Translation filed | 23.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 30.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7110454 (CHAKRABORTY AMIT [US]) [X] 1 * column 7, Figure 1 * [I] 1-11,13,14,16,17,20,21; | [I] - YANWEI FU ET AL, "Multi-View Video Summarization", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20101102), vol. 12, no. 7, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 717 - 729, XP011311047 [I] 1 * Figures 5-6 * | International search | [X]JP2006320650 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [Y]JP2009005020 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [X]JP2010158308 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2010183290 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [Y]JP2011200283 (OLYMPUS CORP) |