EP2823962 - MELAMINE RESIN DECORATIVE SHEET AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING A FINISHED SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd. 5-8 Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2020/22] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Sumitomo Bakelite Company Limited 5-8 Higashi-shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI Kousuke c/o SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD. 5-8 Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2020/23] |
Former [2015/03] | 01 /
ARAI Kousuke c/o SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO. LTD. 5-8 Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/23] |
Former [2015/03] | Hollatz, Christian Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13758261.5 | 06.03.2013 | [2020/23] | WO2013JP56113 | Priority number, date | JP20120050148 | 07.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012050148 | JP20130002889 | 10.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013002889 | [2015/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013133314 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2823962 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2823962 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B32B15/08, B32B15/098, B32B15/20, B32B27/00, B32B27/16, B32B27/18, B32B27/20, B32B27/42, B32B37/18, // B32B17/06, B32B38/06, B44C1/10, B44C5/04 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/098 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/095 (US);
B32B15/16 (US);
B32B15/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/061 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/16 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/42 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/06 (KR);
B32B37/10 (KR);
B32B37/185 (EP,US);
B32B43/00 (US);
B32B5/16 (US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B44C1/105 (EP,US);
B44C5/0415 (EP,US);
B60R13/00 (KR);
B63B29/02 (KR);
B32B15/04 (US);
B32B15/12 (US);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2264/025 (EP,US);
B32B2264/0292 (EP,US);
B32B2305/076 (EP,US);
B32B2307/302 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2309/02 (EP,US);
B32B2309/04 (EP,US);
B32B2309/105 (EP,US);
B32B2309/12 (EP,US);
B32B2311/00 (EP,US);
B32B2311/24 (EP,US);
B32B2333/08 (EP,US);
B32B2375/00 (EP,US);
B32B2379/00 (US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/003 (KR);
B32B2605/08 (KR);
B32B2605/10 (EP,US);
B32B2605/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/04 (US);
B32B38/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31605 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/46] | B32B27/42, B32B15/08, B32B27/00, B32B27/18, B32B7/12, B32B15/098, B32B15/20, B32B27/16 | ||
Former IPC [2015/03] | B32B27/42, B32B15/08, B32B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MELAMINHARZ-SCHMUCKFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR EINER BEARBEITETEN OBERFLÄCHE | [2015/03] | English: | MELAMINE RESIN DECORATIVE SHEET AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING A FINISHED SURFACE | [2015/03] | French: | PLAQUE DÉCORATIVE DE RÉSINE MÉLAMINE, ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE SURFACE FINIE | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2014 | Translation filed | 04.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 26.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2013 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | ES | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.03.2013 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 06.03.2013 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 06.03.2013 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0819794 (PREMARK RWP HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [AD]JP2001096702 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2005246892 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO, et al) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2011068066 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [X] 1-15 * example 1; table 1 * [I] 16,17 | International search | [Y]JP2005246892 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO, et al); | [X]JP2011068066 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [X]JP2011079297 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [XP]WO2012086032 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP], et al); | [XP]JP2012131092 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) | by applicant | JP2001096702 | JP2005246892 |