EP2822737 - TOUCH SENSITIVE ROBOTIC GRIPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quality Manufacturing Inc. 5855 Rockwell Road Winchester, Kentucky 40392 / US | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, Jeffrey A. 2379 Red Pine Road Park City, Utah 84098 / US | 02 /
ROSE, James Adam 857 Malabu Drive Number 7002 Lexington, Kentucky 40502 / US | 03 /
ROSE, Stephen D. 2513 Pascoli Place Lexington, Kentucky 40509 / US | 04 /
COOPER, Raymond 150 Cooper Drive Irvine, Kentucky 40336 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Burton, Nick Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Alton, Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13758426.4 | 08.03.2013 | WO2013US29798 | Priority number, date | US201261608407P | 08.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261608407 P | US201261655949P | 05.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261655949 P | US201261673114P | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673114 P | US201261683324P | 15.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261683324 P | US201261709822P | 04.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261709822 P | US201361767130P | 20.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361767130 P | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013134610 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2822737 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/00, B25J13/08, B25J9/16, B25J19/02, G01B7/00, F04B9/10 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
B25J9/1612 (EP,US);
B25J15/0052 (CN);
B25J13/081 (EP,US);
B25J15/00 (EP,US);
B25J15/0033 (CN);
B25J15/0071 (CN);
B25J18/00 (US);
B25J19/0029 (US);
B25J19/005 (US);
B25J19/02 (EP,US);
B25J19/028 (CN);
F04B9/10 (US);
G01B7/00 (US);
Y10S901/27 (EP,US);
Y10S901/28 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20311 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | B25J15/00, B25J19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSEMPFINDLICHE ROBOTERGREIFER | [2015/03] | English: | TOUCH SENSITIVE ROBOTIC GRIPPER | [2015/03] | French: | PRÉHENSEUR ROBOTIQUE TACTILE | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 15.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4770455 (COLLINS JR EARL R [US]) [Y] 1,2,12,15,16,19 * figures 2,3 * * column 4, line 57 - line 59 * * column 3, line 50 - line 52 * * column 3, line 65 - line 68 * [A] 3-11,13,14,17,18; | [A]US4896914 (STEVENS S SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-19 * figures 1,3,4,15,16; claims 1,15,16 * * column 8, line 38 - line 40 ** column 1, line 6 - line 13 *; | [Y]US2009272201 (LOEB GERALD E [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,12,15,16,19 * paragraph [0004]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0065]; figure 3 * | International search | [X]US4499784 (SHUM LANSON Y [US]); | [X]US4841224 (CHALUPNIK JAMES D [US], et al); | [A]EP0582731 (LEDA LOGARITHMIC ELECT DEVICES [IT]); | [A]JPH07197928 (TORANSAPOOTO KK); | [X]US6209443 (PEREZ JOSE [CA]); | [A]JP2003159689 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP); | [A]US6684754 (COMER ALAN ELBERT [US]); | [A]US2005187657 (HASHIMOTO YOSHIKI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2010133006 (NORGREN INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4770455 | US4896914 | US5633576 | US2009272201 | - BUD TRINKELH, Fluid Power Ebook Edition 1 and Fluid Power Ebook |