EP2883050 - MEMBRANE ASSEMBLY AND A LATERAL FLOW IMMUNOASSAY DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH MEMBRANE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting Dienst Landbouwkundig Onderzoek Droevendaalsesteeg 4 6708 PB Wageningen / NL | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN AMERONGEN, Aart Nijhofflaan 38 NL-3906 ES Veenendaal / NL | 02 /
WICHERS, Jan Herman Rijnhof 2 NL-6715 LS Ede / NL | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2015/25] | Application number, filing date | 13759853.8 | 23.07.2013 | [2016/35] | WO2013NL50548 | Priority number, date | EP20120179818 | 09.08.2012 Original published format: EP 12179818 | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014025251 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2883050 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2883050 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/558 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/54386 (EP,CN);
G01N33/5304 (US);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/558 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEMBRANANORDNUNG UND SEITLICHE FLUSSIMMUNOASSAY-VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER SOLCHEN MEMBRANANORDNUNG | [2016/10] | English: | MEMBRANE ASSEMBLY AND A LATERAL FLOW IMMUNOASSAY DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH MEMBRANE ASSEMBLY | [2015/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MEMBRANES ET DISPOSITIF POUR DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE À ÉCOULEMENT LATÉRAL COMPRENANT UN TEL ENSEMBLE DE MEMBRANES | [2016/10] |
Former [2015/25] | MEMBRANANORDNUNG UND SEITENFLUSS-IMMUNOASSAY-VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER SOLCHEN MEMBRANANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2015/25] | ENSEMBLE À MEMBRANE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMMUNO-ESSAI COMPRENANT CET ENSEMBLE À MEMBRANE | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 18.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2013 | AL | 31.08.2016 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | RS | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.07.2013 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.07.2013 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 23.07.2013 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.07.2013 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0553770 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract, page 3, lines 7-30, page 9, line 19 *; | [A]US5252496 (KANG JEMO [US], et al) [A] 1-14* figure 2, column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 4, column 6, lines 49-58 *; | [A]US2006019406 (WEI NING [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract, paragraphs [0027]-[0028], figure 1 * | by applicant | US5252496 | US5591645 | US2006205059 |