17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
18.05.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
09.06.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
02.06.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
30.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.02.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
11.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.05.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
29.05.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
11.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
23.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|