EP2825911 - PINHOLE MITIGATION FOR OPTICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states View, Inc. 195 South Milpitas Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Robin 264 N. Whisman Road Nr. 8 Mountain View CA 94043 / US | 02 /
KAILASAM, Sridhar 5024 Crandallwood Drive Fremont CA 94555 / US | 03 /
MULPURI, Rao 21142 Sarahills Drive Saratoga CA 95070 / US | 04 /
PARKER, Ronald, M. 9656 Meade Circle North Olive Branch MS 38654 / US | 05 /
POWELL, Ronald, A. 1184 Los Trancos Road Portola Valley CA 94028 / US | 06 /
PRADHAN, Anshu 520 Hunters Mill Cove Collierville TN 38017 / US | 07 /
ROZBICKI, Robert, T. 3002 Oakleigh Manor Lane Germantown TN 38138 / US | 08 /
KHOSLA, Vinod 630 Los Trancos Road Portola Valley CA 94028 / US | [2015/24] |
Former [2015/04] | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Robin 264 N. Whisman Road Nr. 8 Mountain View CA 94043 / US | ||
02 /
KAILASAM, Sridhar 5024 Crandallwood Drive Fremont CA 94555 / US | |||
03 /
MULPURI, Rao 18822 Bellgrove Circle Saratoga CA 95070 / US | |||
04 /
PARKER, Ronald, M. 9656 Meade Circle North Olive Branch MS 38654 / US | |||
05 /
POWELL, Ronald, A. 1184 Los Trancos Road Portola Valley CA 94028 / US | |||
06 /
PRADHAN, Anshu 520 Hunters Mill Cove Collierville TN 38017 / US | |||
07 /
ROZBICKI, Robert, T. 3002 Oakleigh Manor Lane Germantown TN 38138 / US | |||
08 /
KHOSLA, Vinod 630 Los Trancos Road Portola Valley CA 94028 / US | Representative(s) | Johnston, Magnus George Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Johnston, Magnus George Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13760591.1 | 13.03.2013 | [2018/19] | WO2013US31098 | Priority number, date | US201261610241P | 13.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261610241 P | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013138535 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825911 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2825911 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/15 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
G02F1/15 (EP,US);
G02F1/1524 (US);
B01J19/121 (US);
C03C23/0025 (US);
G01M11/0207 (US);
G01R31/08 (US);
G02F1/0147 (US);
G02F1/1309 (US);
G09G3/006 (US);
B05D3/12 (US);
G02F1/15165 (US);
G02F1/153 (EP,US);
G02F1/1533 (US);
G02F1/163 (US);
G02F2201/508 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STIFTLOCHABSCHWÄCHUNG FÜR OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2015/04] | English: | PINHOLE MITIGATION FOR OPTICAL DEVICES | [2015/04] | French: | ATTÉNUATION DE TROU D'ÉPINGLE POUR DISPOSITIFS OPTIQUES | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 18.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18169307.8 / EP3410183 | EP22178681.7 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2013 | AL | 09.05.2018 | AT | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.03.2013 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5635125 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0728099 (NIKON CORP, et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2006001801 (KIM JUNG H [KR], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [X]US2007141360 (BETEILLE FABIEN [FR]) [X] 1,4,6-8,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012026573 (COLLINS MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0037] * | International search | [A]US2004101981 (MORISHITA MASAHIKO [JP]); | [Y]US6834158 (TEMPLETON MICHAEL K [US]); | [A]US2007141360 (BETEILLE FABIEN [FR]); | [Y]US2010074515 (ZHAO GUOHENG [US], et al); | [Y]US2012026573 (COLLINS MARK A [US], et al) |