EP2825620 - COLD FLOW IMPROVEMENT OF DISTILLATE FUELS USING ALPHA-OLEFIN COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P. O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210 / US | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAN, Ben 12645 West Airport Boulevard Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | 02 /
SCHIELD, John, A. 9715 Harrison Lane Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | 03 /
BIGGERSTAFF, Paul, J. 11611 OakLake Park Drive Sugar Land, TX 77498 / US | 04 /
PHAN, Kimchi, T. 6116 Calder Field Drive Katy, TX 77494 / US | 05 /
WARD, Jack, Bradford 1620 South Columbia Place Tulsa, OK 74104 / US | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13761651.2 | 07.03.2013 | WO2013US29586 | Priority number, date | US201261611864P | 16.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261611864 P | US201313786674 | 06.03.2013 Original published format: US201313786674 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013138154 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825620 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/16, C10L1/192, C10L10/14, C10L1/195, C10L1/196, C10L1/19 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
C10L10/14 (EP,US);
C10L1/1641 (EP,US);
C10L1/1905 (US);
C10L1/192 (EP,US);
C10L1/1955 (EP,US);
C10L1/196 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/04] | C10L1/195 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Title | German: | KALTFLUSSVERBESSERUNG VON DESTILLATBRENNSTOFFEN MIT ALPHA-OLEFIN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2015/04] | English: | COLD FLOW IMPROVEMENT OF DISTILLATE FUELS USING ALPHA-OLEFIN COMPOSITIONS | [2015/04] | French: | AMÉLIORATION D'ÉCOULEMENT À FROID DE CARBURANTS DE DISTILLAT À L'AIDE DE COMPOSITIONS D'ALPHA-OLÉFINE | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 08.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010180492 (KRULL MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5-9,12-14 * examples 24-26, 38, 39, 45 *; | [X]US6017859 (ROSSI ALBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009158641 (HAYES HOWARD RICHARD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-14 * example 5; tables 6, 7 * | International search | [X]US6203583 (BOTROS MAGED G [US]); | [A]US2003166811 (PEIFFER DENNIS G [US], et al); | [A]US2007094920 (AHLERS WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [A]US5857287 (SCHIELD JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]US2010325944 (YANG JIANZHONG [US], et al) |