EP2897794 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO FIBRE REINFORCED COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford, Cambridgeshire CB22 4QD / GB | For all designated states Hexcel Holding GmbH Industriestrasse 1 4061 Pasching / AT | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSER, Johannes c/o Hexcel Holding GmbH Schärdinger Strasse 1 A-4061 Pasching / AT | 02 /
HADLEY, Philip 29 Columbine Road Ely Cambridgeshire CB6 3WL / GB | [2015/36] |
Former [2015/31] | 01 /
MOSER, Johannes c/o Hexcel Holding Gmbh Industriestrasse 1 A-4061 Pasching / AT | ||
02 /
HADLEY, Philip 29 Columbine Road Ely Cambridgeshire CB6 3WL / GB | Representative(s) | Pols, Ronald Maarten Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford, Cambridgeshire CB22 4QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Pols, Ronald Maarten Hexcel Composites Limited LAW Ickleton Road Duxford Cambridge CB22 4QD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13762530.7 | 17.09.2013 | WO2013EP69309 | Priority number, date | EP20120185113 | 19.09.2012 Original published format: EP 12185113 | EP20120188249 | 11.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12188249 | EP20130156484 | 22.02.2013 Original published format: EP 13156484 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014044688 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2897794 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B5/10, D04H1/74, D04H3/04 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
B32B5/10 (EP,US);
B29B15/105 (US);
B29B15/12 (EP,US);
B29C70/083 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/024 (EP,US);
B32B5/028 (US);
B32B5/12 (US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C08J5/244 (EP,US);
D04H1/74 (EP,US);
D04H3/04 (EP,US);
D04H3/115 (EP,US);
B29C70/44 (EP,US);
B29C70/504 (EP,US);
B29K2063/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0881 (US);
B29K2281/06 (EP,US);
B29L2031/085 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,US);
B32B2260/023 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2305/076 (US);
B32B2305/28 (US);
B32B2307/514 (EP,US);
B32B2307/554 (EP,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,US);
B32B2307/708 (EP,US);
B32B2307/712 (EP,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP,US);
B32B2603/00 (EP,US);
B32B37/02 (EP,US);
B32B37/203 (EP,US);
B32B38/08 (EP,US);
C08J2363/00 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24124 (EP,US);
Y10T442/10 (EP,US);
Y10T442/643 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT VERSTÄRKTEN VERBUNDWERKSTOFFEN | [2015/31] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO FIBRE REINFORCED COMPOSITES | [2015/31] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS DE OU ASSOCIÉES AUX COMPOSITES RENFORCÉS PAR DES FIBRES | [2020/18] |
Former [2015/31] | PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTÉS OU SE RAPPORTANT À DES COMPOSITES RENFORCÉS DE FIBRES | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 08.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 08.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0768167 (POTT RICHARD [DE]) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 35; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2004078443 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1* figures 2D,2J *; | [A]DE102005000115 (CETEX CHEMNITZER TEXTILMASCHIN [DE]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,6,9 *; | [A]EP1693496 (FUKUI PREFECTURE GOVERNMENT [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006057633 (SCHOLTEN FRIEDHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1,14 * claims 1-10 * | by applicant | EP0768167 | EP1128958 | DE102005000115 | EP1693496 | EP1880819 | DE102006057633 | - CREIGHTON ET AL., A MULTIPLE FIELD IMAGE ANALYSIS PROCEDURE FOR CHARACTERISATION OF FIBRE ALIGNMENT IN COMPOSITES; COMPOSITES: PART A, (2001), vol. 32, pages 221 - 229 |