EP2741873 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR CASTING METAL SLAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novelis, Inc. 191 Evans Avenue Toronto, ON M8Z 1J5 / CA | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATENBY, Kevin Michael 920 Carters Grove Trail Johns Creek, Georgia 30022 / US | 02 /
LUCE, Edward Stanley 102 Sherwood Drive Kingston, Ontario K7M 2E3 / CA | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/25] | Feller, Frank Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13763888.8 | 14.03.2013 | [2016/03] | WO2013CA50194 | Priority number, date | US201261614118P | 22.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261614118 P | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013138925 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2741873 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2741873 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/055, B22D11/06 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
B22D11/0605 (EP,US);
B22D11/0677 (EP,US);
B22D11/068 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/25] | B22D11/055 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GIESSEN VON METALLPLATTEN | [2014/25] | English: | METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR CASTING METAL SLAB | [2014/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA COULÉE D'UNE BRAME DE MÉTAL | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2013 | AL | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | RS | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | SM | 20.01.2016 | IE | 14.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 20.01.2016 | |
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | FI | 20.01.2016 | |
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 20.01.2016 | |
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 20.01.2016 | |
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2010307713 (ITO TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH04123847 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al); | [A]US6755236 (SIVILOTTI OLIVO G [CA], et al); | [A]US6910524 (SIVILOTTI OLIVO G [CA], et al); | [A]US2007215314 (FITZSIMON JOHN [CA], et al); | [A]JP2011245526 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |