06.03.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
18.11.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
01.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.09.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
26.08.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
25.05.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
16.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
16.10.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
25.09.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
22.05.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
24.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.12.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
26.12.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
30.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|