EP2828274 - GREEN LUMINESCENT MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company Chestnut Run Plaza 974 Center Road P.O. Box 2915 Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | [2016/02] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRON, Norman 408 Apple Road Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 02 /
GAO, Weiying 223 Chaingate Circle Landenberg, Pennsylvania 19350 / US | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13764859.8 | 21.03.2013 | WO2013US33209 | Priority number, date | US201261614848P | 23.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261614848 P | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013142634 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828274 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C09K11/06, H01L51/56 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07F15/00 (KR);
H10K85/342 (EP,US);
C07F15/0033 (EP,US);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K30/00 (US);
H10K50/00 (KR);
H10K50/121 (US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | C07F15/00, C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | GRÜNE LEUCHTSTOFFE | [2015/05] | English: | GREEN LUMINESCENT MATERIALS | [2015/05] | French: | MATÉRIAUX LUMINESCENTS VERTS | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 15.03.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2006008673 (KWONG RAYMOND [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US6699599 (LI XIAO-CHANG CHARLES [US], et al); | [A]US2010140605 (SHIBATA KAZUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US7745017 (NAKAMURA TETSUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US7816016 (HERRON NORMAN [US], et al) |