EP2829599 - METHOD FOR INTRODUCING EXOGENOUS DNA BY OVERCOMING RESTRICTION MODIFICATION BARRIER OF TARGET BACTERIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute Of Microbiology, Chinese Academy Of Sciences No.1, West Beichen Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100101 / CN | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEN, Tingyi No.3 1 West Beichen Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100101 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Guoqiang No.3 1 West Beichen Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100101 / CN | 03 /
DENG, Aihua No.3 1 West Beichen Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100101 / CN | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13764964.6 | 21.02.2013 | WO2013CN71730 | Priority number, date | CN20121080124 | 23.03.2012 Original published format: CN201210080124 | [2015/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013139193 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2829599 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12N15/24, C12N1/20, C12R1/19, C12R1/01, C12R1/07, C12R1/085 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12N15/74 (EP,US);
C12N15/75 (EP,US);
C12N9/1007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSCHLEUSEN EXOGENER DNA DURCH ÜBERWINDUNG DER BESCHRÄNKUNGSMODIFIKATIONSBARRIERE EINES ZIELBAKTERIUMS | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD FOR INTRODUCING EXOGENOUS DNA BY OVERCOMING RESTRICTION MODIFICATION BARRIER OF TARGET BACTERIUM | [2015/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'INTRODUCTION D'ADN EXOGÈNE EN SURMONTANT UNE BARRIÈRE DE MODIFICATION DE RESTRICTION D'UNE BACTÉRIE CIBLE | [2015/05] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2014 | Translation filed | 30.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 13.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0185966 (ELSWORTH BIOTECH LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document, in particular p. 5/6 and claims *; | [A] - PALMER B R ET AL, "The dam and dcm strains of Escherichia coli - a review", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 143, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(94)90597-5, ISSN 0378-1119, (19940527), pages 1 - 12, (19940527), XP023540472 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90597-5 | [A] - GUZMAN LM ET AL, "Tight regulation, modulation, and high-level expression by vectors containing the arabinose PBAD Promotor", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19950701), vol. 177, no. 14, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4121 - 4130, XP002121022 [A] 1-10 | [A] - KESSLER C ET AL, "Recognition sequences of restriction endonucleases and methylases - a review", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(85)90119-2, ISSN 0378-1119, (19850101), pages 1 - 102, (19850101), XP025696556 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(85)90119-2 | International search | [XP]CN102618476 (CHINESE ACAD INST MICROBIOLOGY); | [X] - HIROKAZU, SUZUKI ET AL., "Improvement of Transformation Efficiency by Strategic Circumvention of Restriction Barriers in Streptomyces griseus", J. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (20110514), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 675 - 678, XP055164598 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4014/jmb.1102.02038 | [X] - YASUI, KAZUMASA ET AL., "Improvement of bacterial transformation efficiency using plasmid artificial modification efficiency using plasmid artificial modification", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20081112), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 1 - 7, XP055138873 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkn884 | [X] - ZHOU, HAO ET AL., "Non-restricting and methylation deficient Escherichia coli strains for bacterial secondary metabolism research", CHINESE MASTER'S THESES FULL-TEST DATABASE ENGINEERING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY I, (20120115), vol. 2012, no. 01, pages 27 - 32, 39-40, XP008174620 | [XP] - ZHANG, GUOQIANG ET AL., "A Mimicking-of-DNA-Methylation-Patterns Pipeline for Overcoming the Restriction Barrier of Bacteria", PLOS GENET, (20120927), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 1 - 15, XP055164600 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1002987 | [XP] - HIROKAZU, SUZUKI, HOST-MIMICKING STRATEGIES IN DNA METHYLATION FOR IMPROVED BACTERIAL TRANSFORMATION, METHYLATION-FROM DNA, RNA AND HISTONES TO DISEASES AND TREATMENT, (20121128), pages 219 - 236, XP055164601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/51691 | [A] - ROBERTS, RICHARD J., "REBASE-a database for DNA restriction and modification: enzymes, genes and genomes.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20091021), vol. 38, pages D234 - D236, XP055164604 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkp874 | by applicant | - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 38, pages 7133 - 7141 | - MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 37, pages 1066 - 1074 | - APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 74, pages 7817 - 7820 | - MICROBIAL BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 52, pages 541 - 545 | - APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 75, pages 3034 - 3038 | - L M GUZMAN; D BELIN; M J CARSON; J BECKWITH, "Tight regulation, modulation, and high-level expression by vectors containing the arabinose PBAD promoter", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 177, pages 4121 - 30, XP002121022 | - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, vol. 350, pages 87 - 96 | - ZACCHI LF; GOMEZ-RAJA J; DAVIS DA, "Mds3 regulates morphogenesis in Candida albicans through the TOR pathway", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 30, pages 3695 - 3710 | - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 20, page 3790 | - GUOQIANG ZHANG; AIHUA DENG; QINGYANG XU; YONG LIANG; NING CHEN; TINGYI WEN, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 193, no. 12, pages 3142 - 3143 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 409, pages 130 - 137 | - MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 46, pages 25 - 36 | - KOVACH; MICHAEL E.ELZER; PHILIP H.STEVEN HILL; D.ROBERTSON; GREGORY T.FARRIS; MICHAEL A.ROOP II; R. MARTIN PETERSON; KENNETH M., GENE, (1995), vol. 166, no. 1, pages 175 - 176 |