EP2829096 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUBSCRIPTION SHARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAJKO, Gabor 4744 Cheeney St. Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 13764977.8 | 26.02.2013 | WO2013FI50210 | Priority number, date | US201213423653 | 19.03.2012 Original published format: US201213423653 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140025 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2829096 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04W12/04, H04L9/32, H04W8/20, H04L29/06, // H04W84/12 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L9/3268 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US);
H04W12/43 (EP,US);
H04W8/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | H04W12/06, H04W12/04, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR GEMEINSAME TEILNAHME | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUBSCRIPTION SHARING | [2015/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LE PARTAGE D'ABONNEMENT | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 19.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011084117 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0061]; figure 1B * [I] 3-6,10-14; | [A]US2010325427 (EKBERG JAN-ERIK [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]US2006075242 (AISSI SELIM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * | International search | [A]US2006075242 (AISSI SELIM [US], et al); | [A]EP2096830 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]); | [A]US2003163700 (PAATERO LAURI [FI]); | [A]US2010325427 (EKBERG JAN-ERIK [FI], et al); | [A]US7430606 (MEANDZIJA BRANISLAV [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2011084117 | US2010325427 |