EP2828563 - VENT VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.I.H.A. Pty Ltd 1 Sleat Road Applecross WA 6153 / AU | [2017/26] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states P.I.H.A. Pty Ltd 1 Sleat Road Applecross WA 6153 / AU | ||
For all designated states Muir, Jeffrey 580 Hay Street Perth Western Australia 6000 / AU | |||
For all designated states Goodwin, Aaron John Roy Level 1 580 Hay Street Perth Western Australia 6000 / AU | |||
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Piha Pty Ltd. 1 Sleat Road Applecross, Western Australia 6153 / AU | ||
For all designated states Muir, Jeffrey 580 Hay Street Perth Western Australia 6000 / AU | |||
For all designated states Goodwin, Aaron John Roy Level 1 580 Hay Street Perth Western Australia 6000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUIR, Jeffrey c/o Level 1 580 Hay Street Perth Western Australia 6000 / AU | 02 /
GOODWIN, Aaron John Roy c/o Level 1 580 Hay Street Perth Western Australia 6000 / AU | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Murnane, Graham John Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13765007.3 | 20.03.2013 | WO2013AU00280 | Priority number, date | AU20120901126 | 20.03.2012 Original published format: AU 2012901126 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013138856 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828563 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16K24/04, F16K31/20, F16L55/07 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
F16K24/048 (EP,US);
F16K31/26 (EP,US);
F16L55/07 (US);
Y10T137/309 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3099 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | LÜFTUNGSVENTIL | [2015/05] | English: | VENT VALVE | [2015/05] | French: | SOUPAPE D'ÉVENT | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 03.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5988201 (LEBKUCHNER BENNO [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,13-15 * figure - * [I] 6,7,10-12,16,17; | [XI]JP2000234674 (TLV CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7-9,12,14,15 * abstract * [I] 5,6,10,11,13,16,17; | [A]WO2006108223 (HERLIHY GEOFFREY FRANCIS [AU]) [A] 1-17* figure - *; | [XI]EP1840430 (AFRISO EURO INDEX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9,12,14,15 * figure - * [I] 6,10,11,13,16,17 | International search | [X]US5988201 (LEBKUCHNER BENNO [US], et al); | [X]JP2000234674 (TLV CO LTD); | [A]WO2006108223 (HERLIHY GEOFFREY FRANCIS [AU]); | [X]EP1840430 (AFRISO EURO INDEX GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US5988201 | JP2000234674 | WO2006108223 | EP1840430 |