EP2828859 - MULTI-FUNCTION RESISTANCE CHANGE MEMORY CELLS AND APPARATUSES INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83716-9632 / US | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILLS, Scott, E. 1316 S. Gourley St. Boise, ID 83705 / US | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13765158.4 | 13.03.2013 | WO2013US30998 | Priority number, date | US201213428944 | 23.03.2012 Original published format: US201213428944 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013142208 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828859 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G11C13/00, G11C7/10, G11C7/22, G11C11/00, G11C14/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
G11C13/0069 (EP,KR,US);
G11C13/0023 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/005 (EP,US);
G11C11/5685 (US);
G11C13/0002 (EP,US);
G11C13/0011 (EP,KR,US);
G11C13/003 (KR,US);
G11C13/0033 (EP,KR,US);
G11C13/0038 (KR,US);
G11C13/004 (KR,US);
G11C14/00 (EP,KR,US);
G11C2013/0078 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | G11C13/00, G11C7/10, G11C7/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONELLE WIDERSTANDSWECHSELSPEICHERZELLEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN DAMIT | [2015/05] | English: | MULTI-FUNCTION RESISTANCE CHANGE MEMORY CELLS AND APPARATUSES INCLUDING THE SAME | [2015/05] | French: | CELLULES DE MÉMOIRE MULTIFONCTIONS À CHANGEMENT DE RÉSISTANCE ET APPAREIL LES COMPRENANT | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 07.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 26.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.06.2019 | 04.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/46] | 07.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011315947 (KOZICKI MICHAEL N [US]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0020] , [0044] , [0093] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0147]; figure 32 *; | [Y]EP2045814 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO02082452 (AXON TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [A] 3 * page 28, line 6 - page 29, line 17; figure 31 *; | [A]US2012033512 (TAKASE SATORU [JP]) [A] 14-16 * abstract *; | [A]US2009003034 (HAPP THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0042]; figures 7-9 * | [A] - SHIMENG YU ET AL, "Compact Modeling of Conducting-Bridge Random-Access Memory (CBRAM)", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110422), vol. 58, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TED.2011.2116120, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 1352 - 1360, XP011476940 [A] 1-18 * page 1352, column r, paragraph l - page 1353, column l, paragraph f; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TED.2011.2116120 | International search | [X]US2012033512 (TAKASE SATORU [JP]); | [Y]US2010128508 (MAEJIMA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]US2010188885 (TODA HARUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012014164 (KAMOSHIDA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2006002174 (HOSOI YASUNARI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012038393 (SPANSION JAPAN LTD) | by applicant | US2011315947 | EP2045814 | WO02082452 |